Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert J White
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-12480
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Case in other court:Alabama Middle, 3:24-cv-00499
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Power Home Remodeling Group, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer A. Riley
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Ryan Garippo
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Joseph A. Ciucci
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan James Massarello
Represented By
George T. Blackmore
Blackmore Law
contact info
Anthony I. Paronich
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info
Michael L. Greenwald
Greenwald Davidson Radbil PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 11/12 5:10 PM
REPLY to Response re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim Related [+] filed by Power Home Remodeling Group, LLC. (Maatman, Gerald)
Related: [-] ply In Support
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
12 12 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/29 5:43 PM
RESPONSE to9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim filed by Nathan James Massarello. (Greenwald, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
11 11 order Stipulation and Order Thu 10/17 10:06 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting The Parties' Joint Motion for Stipulated Order Striking Plaintiff's Request for Treble Damages. Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (TVil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
10 10 motion Strike Thu 10/10 3:21 PM
Joint MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Request For Treble Damages by Power Home Remodeling Group, LLC. (Maatman, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss Wed 10/09 11:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by Power Home Remodeling Group, LLC. (Maatman, Gerald)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Wed 10/09 9:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Ciucci on behalf of Power Home Remodeling Group, LLC. (Ciucci, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
7 7 notice Notice - Other Fri 10/04 9:44 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS (TVil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
6 6 notice Appearance Thu 09/26 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by George T. Blackmore on behalf of Nathan James Massarello. (Blackmore, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
5 5 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Wed 09/25 9:18 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Nathan James Massarello against Power Home Remodeling Group, LLC. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 09/20 1:52 PM
Docket Sheet from Alabama Middle; Case Number 3:24-cv-00499.
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue Fri 09/20 10:42 AM
ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The 22 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Transfer Case to the US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, construed as an unopposed motion to transfer, is GRANTED; (2) This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan; and, (3) Upon transfer of the case, the Clerk is instructed to terminate all pending motions and deadlines and to close this case. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 9/20/2024. (BES)
Related: [-]
2 2 STIPULATION re 20 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(2) AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF MICHIGAN by Nathan James Massarello. (Paronich, Anthony) [Transferred from almd on 9/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs TRANSFERRED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Power Home Remodeling Group, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AALMDC-3688156.), filed by Nathan James Massarello. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/6/2024. (Stephens, James) Modified on 8/9/2024 to add Class Action & Jury Demand (AM). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/9/2024 to lock down fill-able PDF) (AM). [Transferred from Alabama Middle; Case Number 3:24-cv-00499.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Transferred In - Text-Only Notice Fri 09/20 1:57 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Middle District of Alabama. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
Related: [-]