North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Kimberly A Swank
Case #: 5:24-cv-00542
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
City of Raleigh
P.O. Box 590
Raleigh, NC 27602
Represented By
James B. Trachtman
Raleigh City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Paul Gessner
City Of Raleigh
contact info
Defendant
Lindsay Faust
Defendant
Lloyd's, London
Represented By
Kevin Michael O'Brien
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Webb
Defendant
David V. Mead
Defendant
Rishar P. Monroe
Plaintiff
Abdul Kareem Hernandez
1352 Winston Avenue
Baltimore, MD 21239


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 19, 2025
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 05/19 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding22 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff failed to date the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and is therefore required to refile a corrected Motion making sure to date and sign the Motion and attach the IFP (long form). (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
22 22 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/19 4:21 PM
CORRECTED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abdul Kareem Hernandez. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, May 01, 2025
utility Remark Thu 05/01 10:26 AM
Document19 submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II for review. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 05/01 3:15 PM
Document19 is no longer submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II. Pending response to19 . (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 04/29 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding21 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion is not signed by the Pro Se Plaintiff. A copy of deficiency and Motion is being mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff by US Mail. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/29 12:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Abdul Kareem Hernandez. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP (Long Form)
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/29 12:08 PM
MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal filed by Abdul Kareem Hernandez. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response Tue 04/29 11:55 AM
RESPONSE - Plaintiff's Response To Magistrate Recommendation And Motion to Stay with Good Cause regarding17 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Abdul Kareem Hernandez. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Leave to File Document Tue 04/29 11:37 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Electronically as a Pro Se Plaintiff filed by Abdul Kareem Hernandez. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
17 17 9 pgs motion Memorandum and Recommendations Fri 04/11 4:49 PM
MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lloyd's, London, 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Raleigh. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 4/28/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 4/11/2025. Copy mailed to Plaintiff by US Mail. (Griffin, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
order Order Referring Motion Mon 12/09 2:25 PM
TEXT ORDER: At the direction of the court, the Defendants' motions to dismiss [DE 8 and 12] are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank to prepare a memorandum and recommendation. Entered by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 12/9/2024. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
16 16 6 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/02 1:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Raleigh. (Trachtman, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
15 15 8 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/18 1:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Abdul Kareem Hernandez. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
14 14 misc Rule 12 Letter Tue 10/29 12:10 PM
Rule 12 Letter Issued to City of Raleigh as to12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Copy of letter mailed to Plaintiff.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
13 13 17 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 10/28 2:05 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Raleigh. (Trachtman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A--Court Case Summaries,
Att: 2 Exhibit B--Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Suppress,
Att: 3 Exhibit C--Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Amended Motion to Suppress,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit D--Court case audio file,
Att: 5 Exhibit E--Plaintiff's Comparative Analysis_Body Cam and Discovery Photos,
Att: 6 Exhibit F--Plaintiff's Comparative Analysis Chart,
Att: 7 Exhibit G--Plaintiff's Index of Evidence,
Att: 8 Exhibit H--Order Denying Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Suppress,
Att: 9 Exhibit I--DOI Regarding Searches and Seizures,
Att: 10 Exhibit J--DOI Regarding Body Worn Cameras
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/28 1:57 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Raleigh. (Trachtman, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
11 11 1 pgs misc Rule 12 Letter Wed 10/16 9:56 AM
Rule 12 Letter Issued as to8 MOTION to Dismiss. (Copy of letter mailed to Plaintiff.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
10 10 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 10/15 11:44 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Lloyd's, London identifying Corporate Parent Lloyd's America Holding Inc., Corporate Parent Lloyd's America Ltd. for Lloyd's, London. (O'Brien, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 12 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 10/15 11:40 AM
Memorandum in Support regarding8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Lloyd's, London. (O'Brien, Kevin)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Tue 10/15 11:39 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lloyd's, London. (O'Brien, Kevin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/15 11:35 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Michael O'Brien on behalf of Lloyd's, London. (O'Brien, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/27 4:30 PM
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/27/2024. (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Fri 09/27 3:14 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Notice of Removal. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/26 9:55 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by City of Raleigh. (Trachtman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
4 4 notice Notice-other Wed 09/25 11:17 AM
Notice to Plaintiff regarding1 Notice of Removal. (Copy of notice, along with blank notice of self representation and financial disclosure forms mailed to Plaintiff.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Wed 09/25 11:06 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding:1 Notice of Removal. All counsel should file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 09/20 2:48 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by City of Raleigh (Trachtman, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 2:47 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by James B. Trachtman on behalf of City of Raleigh. (Trachtman, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 09/20 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Raleigh from Wake County Superior Court, case number 24CV022245-910. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7780865), filed by City of Raleigh. (Gessner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A--Summons to City,
Att: 2 Exhibit B--Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C--Certificate of Filing of Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D--Court case audio file,
Att: 5 Exhibit E--Visual comparison,
Att: 6 Exhibit F--Comparative analysis,
Att: 7 Exhibit G--Evidence Supporting Plaintiff's Affidavit,
Att: 8 Exhibit H--Plaintiff's Affidavit,
Att: 9 Exhibit I--Petition to Sue as Indigent,
Att: 10 Exhibit J--Amended Complaint,
Att: 11 Exhibit K--Certificate of Service re Amended Complaint,
Att: 12 Exhibit L--Notice of Filing the Notice of Removal,
Att: 13 Exhibit M--Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 14 Exhibit N--Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet