Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Karoline Mehalchick
Case #: 4:24-cv-01592
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Terminated:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Central Keystone Federal Credit Union
Defendant
Kris Kauffman
Defendant
William Swinehart
Plaintiff
Adam Shingara
P/O. Box 594
Treverton, PA 17881
Plaintiff
Erica Shingara
P.O. Box 594
Treverton, PA 17881


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 13, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 01/13 10:57 AM
ORDER - NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Report of Judge Arbuckle7 is ADOPTED IN ITS ENTIRETY as the decision of the Court. Plaintiffs amended complaint is DISMISSED.5 . The Clerk is directed to mark this matter CLOSED. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 1/13/2025 (cw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 12/18 11:51 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re5 Amended Complaint filed by Adam M. Shingara - it is RECOMMENDED that: (1) Plaintiff's amended complaint be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and because this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. This dismissal should be without leave to amend, but without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to pursue his breach of contract claim in state court or amend his claim and assert it in Shingara v. Kauffman, 4:24-CV-1634 (M.D. Pa.). (2) The Clerk of Court be directed to CLOSE this case. Objections to R&R due by 1/6/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 12/18/2024. (caw)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/18 10:10 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Adam and Erica Shingara's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis2 is GRANTED as to the remaining plaintiff, Adam Shingara only. (2) Adam Shingara's amended complaint (Doc. 5) is DEEMED filed. (3) Adam Shingara is reminded that he has an affirmative obligation to keep the Court informed of his current address. If Adam Shingara's address changes while this lawsuit is pending, he must immediately inform the Court in writing. If the Court is unable to communicate with Adam Shingara because he has failed to notify the Court of his address, he may be deemed to have abandoned the lawsuit. (4) The Court will conduct a preliminary review of Adam Shingara's amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Summons will not be issued until the screening process is complete. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 12/18/2024. (caw)
Related: [-]
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case Wed 12/18 11:43 AM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Karoline Mehalchick and referred to Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/11 4:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Adam M. Shingara. (ea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Homeowners Protection Act Worksheet
Friday, September 20, 2024
4 4 misc Pro Se Letter issued - MJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Fri 09/20 1:06 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED to Erica G. Shingara providing the case number. (ea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules
3 3 misc Pro Se Letter issued - MJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Fri 09/20 1:04 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED to Adam M. Shingara providing the case number. (ea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/20 1:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam M. Shingara, Erica G. Shingara. (ea)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/20 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Central Keystone Federal Credit Union lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Adam M. Shingara, Erica G. Shingara. (ea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Praecipe for Judgment by Default,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Northumberland County Complaint,
Att: 4 1 pgs Notice of Sale Sheriff's Sale,
Att: 5 1 pgs Letter to Plaintiff from Central Keystone Federal Credit Union