Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:24-cv-01667
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Terminated:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
UR M. Jaddou
Defendant
Antonio Donis
Defendant
Ted H. Kim
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Plaintiff
Nikta Najib
Represented By
Parastoo Golesorkhi-Zahedi
Parastoo Golesorkhi Zahedi PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/30 4:47 PM
ORDERED that the Complaint is DISMISSED, and the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to place this action among the ended causes. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/30/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/24 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nikta Najib (Golesorkhi-Zahedi, Parastoo)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 09/23 4:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Antonio Donis, UR M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Friday, September 20, 2024
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 09/20 1:51 PM
Proposed Summons by Nikta Najib.(Golesorkhi-Zahedi, Parastoo) (Attachment 5 replaced on 9/20/2024) (dvanm, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Supplement,
Att: 3 Supplement,
Att: 4 Supplement,
Att: 5 Supplement
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/20 1:50 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9751340.), filed by Nikta Najib.(Golesorkhi-Zahedi, Parastoo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 09/20 3:21 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (dvanm)
Related: [-]