New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Case #: 1:24-cv-06650
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Warren Glover
Defendant
Josh Hantman
Represented By
Shemori Corinthian
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Ari Lieberman
Represented By
Shemori Corinthian
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Miranda
Defendant
Philip Schaffroth
Defendant
The City of New York
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Shemori Corinthian
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
The New York City Department of Finance
Represented By
Shemori Corinthian
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Furney Canteen
Represented By
Paul Liggieri
L & D Law P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Wed 05/07 5:46 PM
Letter indicating the documents being served today on Plaintiff by Warren Glover, Josh Hantman, Ari Lieberman, Anthony Miranda, Philip Schaffroth, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Finance (Corinthian, Shemori)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
order Scheduling Order Mon 03/17 10:01 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court adopts the parties' joint proposed briefing schedule. Defendants' motion to dismiss is due on May 7, 2025 . Plaintiff's opposition is due on May 28, 2025 . Defendants' reply, if any, is due on June 18, 2025 . As a courtesy to the Court, the parties are encouraged not to file their motion papers until the motion is fully briefed. If the parties follow this practice, the notice of motion, all supporting papers, and all opposition papers are to be served on the other parties along with a cover letter setting forth whom the attorney represents and the papers being served. Only a copy of the cover letter should be filed electronically, as a letter and not as a motion, on the day the motion, supporting brief, or opposition brief is due. On the day the motion is fully briefed, in this case June 18, 2025, each party shall electronically file its motion papers. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/17/2025. (NS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Fri 03/14 10:46 AM
Letter concering the parties joint proposed briefing schedule for Defendants anticipated motion by Warren Glover, Josh Hantman, Ari Lieberman, Anthony Miranda, Philip Schaffroth, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Finance (Corinthian, Shemori)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
order Order(Other) Mon 03/10 9:17 AM
The Court previously directed the parties to file a joint briefing schedule for Defendants' motion to dismiss by 3/6/2025. To date, no briefing schedule has been filed. The Court sua sponte extends the time for the parties to file a joint briefing schedule to 3/14/2025 . Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/10/2025. (NS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/04 7:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Warren Glover, Josh Hantman, Ari Lieberman, Anthony Miranda, Philip Schaffroth, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Finance, filed by Furney Canteen. (Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 02/13 2:15 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants'11 request for a pre-motion conference for an anticipated motion to dismiss and Plaintiff's13 response letter, where he seeks leave to amend the1 Complaint for multiple claims. The Court denies the motion for a pre-motion conference as unnecessary. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint by 3/6/2025 . Further, on 3/6/2025 , the parties shall file a joint briefing schedule for Defendants' motion to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/13/2025. (NS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Wed 02/12 7:06 PM
Letter in opposition to Defendants' motion letter for a conference (MTD) by Furney Canteen (Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/11 10:05 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file the pre-motion conference response is granted. The response is due 2/13/2025 . Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/11/2025. (NS)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/10 8:57 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Furney Canteen. (Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
11 11 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 02/05 5:07 PM
First MOTION for pre motion conference . (Corinthian, Shemori)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Wed 02/05 4:48 PM
ORDER: The Court previously ordered Defendants to file a pre-motion conference letter that complies with the Court's Individual Practices and Rules by 2/3/2025. To date, Defendants have not filed that letter. The Court sua sponte extends the filing deadline to 2/17/2025. Defendants are warned that if they fail to meet this extended deadline, they will be deemed to be in default. ( See Judge Pamela K. Chen's Individual Practices and Rules, Par. 3(A) ("Service of the letter motion within the time requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 or 56, or any other applicable filing or service deadline, shall constitute timely service of a motion made pursuant to those provisions.").) Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/5/2025. (NS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Mon 01/13 11:04 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (BBM)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Mon 01/13 7:10 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants City of New York and New York City Department of Finance, Ari Liberman, and Joshua Hantman's10 letter stating that they "intend to file a 12(b) motion." In accordance with this Court's Individual Rule 3.A, Defendants shall file and serve a pre-motion conference letter "not to exceed three (3) pages in length setting forth the basis for the anticipated motion" by 2/3/2025 . Plaintiff shall file and serve a response to Defendants' letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, by 2/10/2024 . Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/13/2025. (NS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Fri 01/10 4:04 PM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (KC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
10 10 misc Letter Wed 01/08 5:36 PM
Letter by The New York City Department of Finance, The City of New York, Ari Lieberman, Josh Hantman (Corinthian, Shemori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order to Answer ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/06 12:26 PM
ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file answer or dispositive motion9 is granted. Defendants City of New York, New York City Department of Finance, Joshua Hantman, and Ari Lieberman shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 1/15/2025 . The parties are reminded that this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge pursuant to the Court's Direct Assignment Pilot Program, which is governed by Administrative Order 2023-23. The Administrative Order, answers to Frequently Asked Questions about the Pilot Program, information about consenting to a Magistrate Judge, and a biography of the Magistrate Judge assigned to this case are on the Court's website at [LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program] . The parties are respectfully directed to confer regarding whether both parties consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned Magistrate Judge. If the parties so consent, the parties should file the consent form available at [LINK:https://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge] . The parties are also respectfully reminded that, unless all parties consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, if a party intends to file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b), that party must file a letter no longer than one page indicating such intent in order to facilitate assignment of this case to a District Judge as the presiding judge. See Admin. Order No. 2023-23 at 2. Any such letter shall be filed by 1/8/2025 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 11/6/2024. (ERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/04 12:02 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Dispositive Motion by The New York City Department of Finance, The City of New York, Ari Lieberman, Josh Hantman. (Corinthian, Shemori)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/04 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shemori Corinthian on behalf of The New York City Department of Finance, The City of New York, Ari Lieberman, Josh Hantman (aty to be noticed) (Corinthian, Shemori)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 10/07 11:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Warren Glover, Josh Hantman, Ari Lieberman, Anthony Miranda, Philip Schaffroth, The City of New York. (SG)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/04 2:01 PM
Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons by Furney Canteen (Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Rider
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Wed 10/02 10:54 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The full case caption must appear on the summons., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 10/01 3:38 PM
Proposed Summons. by Furney Canteen (Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Rider
Friday, September 20, 2024
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 09/20 4:23 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Fri 09/20 4:21 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/20 2:36 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Furney Canteen (Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/20 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Furney Canteen against Warren Glover, Josh Hantman, Ari Lieberman, Anthony Miranda, Philip Schaffroth, The City of New York filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18303286 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Furney Canteen. (Liggieri, Paul)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/20 4:21 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Fri 09/20 4:22 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]