Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter C Mckittrick
Case #: 6:24-bk-62115
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Dismissed:Dec 10, 2024
Terminated:Jan 22, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Hagen Construction LLC
4909 S Coast Hwy # 210
South Beach, OR 97366-0817
Represented By
DOUGLAS R HOLBROOK
Holbrook Law LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Eugene
405 E 8th Ave #1100
Eugene, OR 97401


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, January 27, 2025
68 68 court Discharge of Subchapter V Trustee (text-only) Mon 01/27 9:29 AM
(Text-only entry) Based on the trustee's final report, the Subchapter V Trustee Kenneth S Eiler is discharged. (bd)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 26, 2025
67 67 trustee Ch 11 SubV Trustee's Report of No Distribution B - case dsm/conv, fee award received Sun 01/26 7:23 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution (Final Report). Funds Collected: $6,640.38. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 4 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $122552.61, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Trustee Kenneth S Eiler. (Eiler, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
66 66 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Fri 01/24 9:11 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:65 Order approving Trustee's Account, Discharging Trustee and Closing Case. (NOTE: IF any related adversary proceeding is pending at the closing of this case, then all further adversary entries will be on the adversary docket) (bd). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
65 65 order Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 01/22 1:08 PM
Order approving Trustee's Account, Discharging Trustee and Closing Case. (NOTE: IF any related adversary proceeding is pending at the closing of this case, then all further adversary entries will be on the adversary docket) (bd)
Related: [-]