Arizona District Court
Judge:John J Tuchi
Case #: 2:24-mc-00030
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, March 21, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/21 11:31 AM
NOTICE re: of Withdrawal OF PLAINTIFF/JUDGMENT CREDITORS OBJECTION TO GARNISHEES ANSWER by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund re:23 Objection . (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Mon 03/17 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paloma Scheiferstein on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank. (Scheiferstein, Paloma)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
24 24 misc Affidavit Fri 03/07 2:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Process Service of Process by Plaintiff Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund. (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
23 23 misc Objection Wed 03/05 2:55 PM
OBJECTION to Garnishee's Answer by Plaintiff Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund.(Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, February 28, 2025
22 22 respoth Answer to Writ of Garnishment Fri 02/28 2:24 PM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re:21 Writ Issued by Wells Fargo Bank. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 order Writ Issued Tue 02/18 3:35 PM
WRIT of Garnishment (Non-Earnings) issued to Wells Fargo Bank re:20 Application for Writ. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
20 20 misc Application for Writ Tue 02/18 3:31 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (Non-Earnings) from Wells Fargo Bank by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund.(KLG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Garnishment,
Att: 2 Declaration
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney) Tue 12/31 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/EMAIL/FIRM NAME by Gerald Barrett. (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
18 18 order Judgment Fri 12/06 10:03 AM
JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiff/Judgment Creditor Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund and against Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank in the net amount of $98,419.61, awarding Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank the sum of $125.00 as reasonable compensation for answering the writ with such amount to be withheld from the total funds subject to garnishment, and discharging Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/6/2024. (KJ)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment Fri 12/06 10:01 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff/Judgment Creditor's Application for Judgment Re: Doc 6 and 11 (Doc.14 ). The Court will enter partial judgment separately. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/6/2024. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
16 16 service Service Executed Fri 11/08 3:09 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund: Affidavit of Service re: Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects, Notice of Deposition upon Angel Aguilar on 11/05/2024. (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
14 14 motion Judgment Mon 11/04 12:57 PM
MOTION for Judgment Against Garnishee Wells Fargo Bank by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund.(Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Judgment
minute_ord ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/04 1:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter has been randomly assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future filings shall reflect the following complete case number: MC 24-00030 PHX-JJT. Pending: Plaintiff/Judgment Creditor's Application for Judgment Re: Doc 6 and 11 (Doc.14 ). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Deposition Tue 10/29 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Deposition of Angel Aguilar, filed by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund.(Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Subpoena Duces Tecum,
Att: 2 Attachment Schedule A
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
12 12 respoth Answer to Writ of Garnishment Wed 10/23 3:38 PM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Tweet-Garot Mechanical Incorporated. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
11 11 respoth Answer to Writ of Garnishment Mon 10/21 12:00 PM
ANSWER to6 Writ of Garnishment by Wells Fargo Bank. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
4 4 service Service Executed Tue 10/15 3:13 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund: Affidavit of Service re: Writ and Summons (Non Earnings); Underlying Judgment; Instructions to Garnishee; Answer; Notice to Judgment Debtor; Request for Hearing; Notice of Hearing (unsigned) upon Sun Mechanical Contracting, Inc. on 10/10/2024. (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Service Executed Tue 10/15 3:11 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund: Affidavit of Service re: Writ and Summons (Non Earnings); Underlying Judgment; Instructions to Garnishee; Answer; Notice to Judgment Debtor; Request for Hearing; Notice of Hearing (unsigned) upon Wells Fargo Bank on 10/10/2024. (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Service Executed Tue 10/15 3:08 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund: Affidavit of Service re: Writ and Summons (Non Earnings); Underlying Judgment; Instructions to Garnishee; Answer; Notice to Judgment Debtor; Request for Hearing; Notice of Hearing (unsigned) upon Tweet-Garot Mechanical, Inc. on 10/11/2024. (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 order Writ Issued Tue 10/15 4:13 PM
WRIT of Garnishment (Non-Earnings) issued upon Sun Mechanical Contracting Incorporated as to A1 Mechanical Insulation LLC re:9 Application for Writ. (KJ)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Application for Writ Tue 10/15 4:10 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (Non-Earnings) upon Sun Mechanical Contracting Incorporated by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund.(KJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
8 8 order Writ Issued Tue 10/15 4:06 PM
WRIT of Garnishment (Non-Earnings) issued upon Tweet-Garot Mechanical Incorporated as to A1 Mechanical Insulation LLC re:7 Application for Writ. (KJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Application for Writ Tue 10/15 4:04 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (Non-Earnings) upon Tweet-Garot Mechanical Incorporated by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund.(KJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
6 6 order Writ Issued Tue 10/15 4:02 PM
WRIT of Garnishment (Non-Earnings) issued upon Wells Fargo Bank as to A1 Mechanical Insulation LLC re:5 Application for Writ. (KJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Application for Writ Tue 10/15 3:58 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (Non-Earnings) upon Wells Fargo Bank by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund.(KJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, September 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Miscellaneous Case Opening - Fees Fri 09/20 12:04 PM
Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Registration of Foreign Judgments - 28 U.S.C. 1963. Case Opening Fee Received: $52.00 receipt number AAZDC23483947 filed by Trustees of the National Asbestos Workers Medical Fund. (submitted by Garald Barrett)(REK)
Related: [-]