Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:24-cv-12486
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
John S. Weinberg
Defendant
Kimberly A. Casiano
Defendant
James D. Farley, Jr.
Defendant
Alexandra Ford English
Defendant
Henry Ford III
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Defendant
William Clay Ford, Jr.
Defendant
Lynn Vojvodich Radakovich
Defendant
William Helman IV
Defendant
William E. Kennard
Defendant
John T. Lawler
Defendant
John C. May
Defendant
Beth E. Mooney
Defendant
John L. Thornton
Defendant
John B. Veihmeyer
Plaintiff
Paul Gagne
Represented By
Timothy Brown
The Brown Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
18 18 notice Appearance Mon 05/19 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Engel on behalf of Kimberly A. Casiano, James D. Farley, Jr., Alexandra Ford English, Henry Ford III, Ford Motor Company, William Clay Ford, Jr., William Helman IV, William E. Kennard, John T. Lawler, John C. May, Beth E. Mooney, John L. Thornton, John B. Veihmeyer, Lynn Vojvodich Radakovich, John S. Weinberg. (Engel, Susan)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Appearance Mon 05/19 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Renatta A. Gorski on behalf of Kimberly A. Casiano, James D. Farley, Jr., Alexandra Ford English, Henry Ford III, Ford Motor Company, William Clay Ford, Jr., William Helman IV, William E. Kennard, John T. Lawler, John C. May, Beth E. Mooney, John L. Thornton, John B. Veihmeyer, Lynn Vojvodich Radakovich, John S. Weinberg. (Gorski, Renatta)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance Mon 05/19 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Siciliano on behalf of Kimberly A. Casiano, James D. Farley, Jr., Alexandra Ford English, Henry Ford III, Ford Motor Company, William Clay Ford, Jr., William Helman IV, William E. Kennard, John T. Lawler, John C. May, Beth E. Mooney, John L. Thornton, John B. Veihmeyer, Lynn Vojvodich Radakovich, John S. Weinberg. (Siciliano, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Appearance Mon 05/19 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michele D Johnson on behalf of Kimberly A. Casiano, James D. Farley, Jr., Alexandra Ford English, Henry Ford III, Ford Motor Company, William Clay Ford, Jr., William Helman IV, William E. Kennard, John T. Lawler, John C. May, Beth E. Mooney, John L. Thornton, John B. Veihmeyer, Lynn Vojvodich Radakovich, John S. Weinberg. (Johnson, Michele)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Appearance Mon 05/19 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Clubok on behalf of Kimberly A. Casiano, James D. Farley, Jr., Alexandra Ford English, Henry Ford III, Ford Motor Company, William Clay Ford, Jr., William Helman IV, William E. Kennard, John T. Lawler, John C. May, Beth E. Mooney, John L. Thornton, John B. Veihmeyer, Lynn Vojvodich Radakovich, John S. Weinberg. (Clubok, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
13 13 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 05/16 2:22 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ford Motor Company (Meyers, Roger)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Appearance Fri 05/16 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roger P. Meyers on behalf of All Defendants. (Meyers, Roger)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Appearance Fri 05/16 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of All Defendants. (Douglas, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
10 10 notice Appearance Tue 05/13 5:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Smilow on behalf of Berel Rosenfeld IRA, Leah Rosenfeld IRA. (Smilow, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance Tue 05/13 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Rubin on behalf of Berel Rosenfeld IRA, Leah Rosenfeld IRA. (Rubin, Joshua)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Tue 05/13 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David C Katz on behalf of Berel Rosenfeld IRA, Leah Rosenfeld IRA. (Katz, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
7 7 motion Consolidate Cases Mon 05/12 4:14 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Co-Lead Counsel by Berel Rosenfeld IRA, Leah Rosenfeld IRA. (Lienhardt, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - The Miller Law Firm, P.C. Firm Resume,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Weiss Law Firm Resume
6 6 notice Appearance Mon 05/12 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Lienhardt on behalf of Berel Rosenfeld IRA, Leah Rosenfeld IRA. (Lienhardt, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
5 5 order Reassignment/Disqualification Thu 12/19 10:27 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
4 4 notice Notice - Other Wed 12/11 5:51 PM
NOTICE by Paul Gagne Civil Cover Sheet - Notice of Companion Cases (Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
3 3 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/23 11:18 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ford Motor Company served on 9/23/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 09/23 9:16 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
1 1 135 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 09/20 5:08 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Paul Gagne against Kimberly A. Casiano, James D. Farley, Jr., Alexandra Ford English, Henry Ford III, Ford Motor Company, William Clay Ford, Jr., William Helman IV, William E. Kennard, John T. Lawler, John C. May, Beth E. Mooney, John L. Thornton, John B. Veihmeyer, Lynn Vojvodich Radakovich, John S. Weinberg with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9947808 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Brown, Timothy)
Related: [-]