Maine District Court
Judge:John C Nivison
Case #: 2:24-cv-00329
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2615 Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
TILSON TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT INC
Represented By
STEVEN J. SILVER
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
EVAN H GRIFFITH
Represented By
JONATHAN M. GOODMAN
Troubh Heisler LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 31, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/31 2:44 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by EVAN H GRIFFITH by Stipulation of the Parties (GOODMAN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
10 10 misc Declaration Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/03 11:57 AM
DECLARATION Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge. The Parties CONSENT to the Magistrate Judge. (SILVER, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/23 9:03 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/12/2025. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/19/2025. Motions due by 6/2/2025. Ready for Trial on 8/4/2025. Declaration Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge due by 1/6/2025. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Fri 12/20 3:31 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TILSON TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT INC. (SILVER, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/20 3:26 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by TILSON TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT INC.(SILVER, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/07 10:32 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to December 20, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 11/07 1:23 PM
Reset Answer Deadline for TILSON TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT INC Pursuant to Order 6 : Answer due by 12/20/2024. (mtm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
5 5 motion Extend Time to Answer Wed 11/06 3:53 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by TILSON TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT INC Responses due by 11/27/2024. (SILVER, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
4 4 misc Waiver Thu 10/03 10:08 AM
SERVICE Returned Executed as to DEFENDANT TILSON TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT INC filed by EVAN H GRIFFITH. (GOODMAN, JONATHAN) Modified on 10/3/2024 to update filing and docket text to correct event (mtm)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 10/03 1:08 PM
Set Answer Deadline for TILSON TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT, INC : Answer due by 11/22/2024. (mtm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/20 3:27 PM
Summons Issued as to TILSON TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (cjd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/20 3:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/20 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT against TILSON TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by EVAN H GRIFFITH. (Service of Process Deadline 12/19/2024) Fee due by 9/23/2024.(cjd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
misc Case Opening Filing Fee Paid Fri 09/20 3:32 PM
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-3007324.), filed by EVAN H GRIFFITH.(GOODMAN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]