New York Southern District Court
Judge:John P Cronan
Case #: 1:24-cv-07162
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Bridget Bahl
Represented By
Mark S Landman
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Tina S. Bhatt
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Chiodo
Represented By
Mark S Landman
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Tina S. Bhatt
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jung Turnipseed
Represented By
Alexander M. White
Valli Kane & Vagnini, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/12 10:47 AM
STIPULATION OFVOLUNTARY DISMISSALWITH PREJUDICE IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, attorneys of record for the respective parties in the above-captioned action, that pursuant to Rule 4l(a)(l)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, all the claims asserted or that could have been asserted in the above-captioned action are hereby voluntarily dismissed with prejudice and without costs, fees, or expenses. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/12/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/11 9:50 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 17 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge John P. Cronan for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) case. (nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/10 4:31 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Bridget Bahl, Michael Chiodo and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Jung Turnipseed. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(White, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/07 12:27 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Alexander M. White. RE-FILE Document No. 16 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
16 16 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/06 3:11 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Bridget Bahl, Michael Chiodo and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Jung Turnipseed. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(White, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 02/18 5:52 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Settlement Accordingly, the settlement is approved. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal or a status letter no later than thirty days from the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket Number 14. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 2/18/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
14 14 motion Settlement Fri 02/14 5:48 PM
MOTION for Settlement Approval of FLSA Settlement . Document filed by Jung Turnipseed..(White, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-3
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
13 13 order Memo Endorsement 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/15 11:19 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:12 Letter filed by Jung Turnipseed ENDORSEMENT All deadlines in this case are adjourned sine die. By February 14, 2025, the parties shall file the necessary paperwork for the Court to review the proposed settlement under the standards of Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), and that case's progeny. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 1/14/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
12 12 misc Letter Mon 01/13 11:16 AM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alexander M. White dated January 13, 2025 re: Settlement and Current Deadlines. Document filed by Jung Turnipseed..(White, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 12/18 2:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Cronan: Telephone conference held on December 16, 2024. As discussed at conference, Defendant Bridget Bahl and proposed defendant-intervenor The Bar Fashion, LLC shall file any motion to intervene and compel arbitration by January 24, 2025. Plaintiffs opposition is due by February 14, 2025. Any reply is due by February 28, 2025. The parties shall file a joint letter by January 17, 2025 advising the Court as to the status of Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Michael Chiodo. Defendant Chiodos deadline to answer the Complaint is extended sine die pending the receipt of the parties joint letter. (Court Reporter Lisa Franko) (mhe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
11 11 order Order Tue 12/10 2:36 PM
ORDER The telephone conference scheduled for December 16, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. will be held on Webex. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (855) 244-8681, access code 2302 755 2307 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan) (Text Only Order) (mhe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Wed 11/27 11:20 AM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' pre-motion letter requesting a conference on Defendants' anticipated motions to intervene, compel arbitration, and dismiss, as well as Plaintiff's letter in response. Dkts. 8, 9. Having reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court concludes that a pre-motion conference in this matter would be beneficial. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear before the undersigned for a teleconference on December 16, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. At that time, counsel should call (202) 503-1666, conference ID 689 074 293#. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket Number 8. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 12/16/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/27/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Tue 11/26 6:32 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alexander M. White dated November 26, 2024 re: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' November 22, 2024 Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Jung Turnipseed..(White, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
8 8 motion Conference Fri 11/22 2:21 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference Re. Motion to Intervene and Compel Arbitration or Dismiss addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Mark S. Landman dated November 22, 2024. Document filed by Bridget Bahl, Michael Chiodo..(Landman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Executed Offer Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. JAMS Employment Arbitration Rules
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tina S. Bhatt on behalf of Bridget Bahl, Michael Chiodo..(Bhatt, Tina)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 1:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark S Landman on behalf of Bridget Bahl, Michael Chiodo..(Landman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/23 1:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bridget Bahl waiver sent on 9/23/2024, answer due 11/22/2024; Michael Chiodo waiver sent on 9/23/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. Document filed by Jung Turnipseed..(White, Alexander)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 09/23 10:43 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bridget Bahl, Michael Chiodo. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 09/23 10:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 09/23 10:37 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 09/23 10:37 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 09/23 10:37 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/20 5:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bridget Bahl and Michael Chiodo, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jung Turnipseed..(White, Alexander)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/20 5:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(White, Alexander)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/20 5:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Bridget Bahl, Michael Chiodo. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29927569)Document filed by Jung Turnipseed..(White, Alexander)
Related: [-]