Arizona District Court
Judge:Diane J Humetewa
Case #: 2:24-cv-02509
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Terminated:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 1:56 AM MST
Defendant
AngioDynamics Incorporated
Defendant
Navilyst Medical Incorporated
Plaintiff
Mishelle Fresener
Represented By
Ryan J Cavanaugh
Constant Legal
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, October 17, 2024
misc Remark (Public) Thu 10/17 1:47 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in Southern District of California. New Case Number: 3:24-cv-1910. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel Wed 10/16 7:21 PM
CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) Transferring Case to the Southern District of California Re MDL-3125. (MAP)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (Public) Wed 10/16 7:22 PM
Remark: Case Transferred to the Southern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 09/25 9:36 AM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon any Defendant(s) who have not yet appeared and shall file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/24/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
8 8 service Service Executed Tue 09/24 10:33 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mishelle Fresener: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 9/23/2024 to Navilyst Medical, Inc. . (Cavanaugh, Ryan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Service Executed Tue 09/24 10:32 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mishelle Fresener: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 9/23/2024 to AngioDynamics, Inc. . (Cavanaugh, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
6 6 5 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 09/23 12:11 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on December 19, 2024, the Clerk of Court, without further notice, shall terminate any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/23/2024. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Fri 09/20 3:42 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Mishelle Fresener. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Attorney information must be typed in the upper left corner. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 09/20 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to AngioDynamics Incorporated, Navilyst Medical Incorporated.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
3 3 misc New Case Opened Fri 09/20 3:38 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-2348557. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-02509 PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Fri 09/20 3:37 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Mishelle Fresener. (submitted by Ryan Cavanaugh)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/20 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-2348557 filed by Mishelle Fresener. (submitted by Ryan Cavanaugh)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet