California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 3:24-cv-06632
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1319 Clean Water Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 2:03 AM PDT
Defendant
Travis Moreda
Represented By
Alexander Moore
King & Spalding
contact info
Peter Hsiao
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Travis Moreda Dairy
Represented By
Alexander Moore
King & Spalding
contact info
Peter Hsiao
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Californians for Alternatives to Toxics
Represented By
William Nazar Carlon
Law Office Of William Carlon
contact info
David Hutchings Williams
Law Offices Of David H. Williams
contact info
Brian Darwin Acree
Law Office Of Brian Acree
contact info
William Leonard Verick
Klamath Environmental Law Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
27 27 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/21 11:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang: Pre-Settlement Planning Conference held via Zoom on 4/21/2025. The Judicial Settlement Conference is set for 6/23/2025 at 10:30 AM in-person, in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Counsel for all parties are directed to review Judge Kang's Standing Order for Settlement Conferences. The last day for settlement conference statements (as well as confidential statements) is June 6, 2025 and should emailed to PHKSettlement@cand.uscourts.gov. Parties shall advise the court of attendees' names no later than 3pm on June 19th to PHKsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov. Total Time (Not Recorded): 11:01-11:20am (19m). Plaintiff Attorney: William Carlon. Defendant Attorney: Peter Hsiao, Alex Moore. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2025)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
26 26 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/10 3:17 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING PRE-SETTLEMENT PLANNING CONFERENCE. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Peter H. Kang for settlement. Per Judge Kang's Settlement Conference Standing Order, and further in light of the Court's schedule, the Court sets a Pre-settlement Planning Conference for Monday, April 21, 2025 at 11:00am before Judge Kang. The Planning Conference will be held via a non-public Zoom meeting. The Court directs counsel for all parties to review and comply with Judge Kang's Settlement Conference Standing Order prior to the Planning Conference, particularly the meet and confer requirements for scheduling the Settlement Conference itself. At the Planning Conference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss and the Court will set the final date for the Settlement Conference. Appearances by Counsel: All counsel shall provide advance notice to the Court if they will be participating in the Planning Conference, in order for Court to ensure proper participation in the Zoom meeting. Each party shall send a list of names of each participating attorney, their email addresses, and party they are representing to Judge Kang's Courtroom Deputy via email at PHKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than close of business on April 18, 2025. Zoom Meeting Access: Information on how to join the Planning Conference can be found on Judge Kang's webpage on the Court's website under the subheading Non-Public Hearings [Pre-Settlement Conferences] at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/peter-h-kang-phk/] General Order 58: The Court reminds all persons granted access to Court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings from a location outside the Courthouse (including screenshots or other audio or visual copying of a hearing or conference) are prohibited, absent prior written authorization from the Chief Judge. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Zoom Guidance and Setup can be found on the Court's website: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order Thu 04/10 7:55 AM
[IN-CHAMBERS TEXT ONLY ORDER]: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Peter H. Kang for settlement. In accordance with Judge Kang's Settlement Conference Standing Order, the Parties are to meet and confer by April 16, 2025 , to determine three mutually agreeable dates and times for the Court to hold the Pre-Settlement Planning Conference between April 21, 2025, and May 16, 2025 ; immediately following the meet and confer, the Parties are to send the three dates to Judge Kang's Courtroom Deputy via email at [LINK:PHKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov] . The Court directs counsel for all Parties to review and comply with Judge Kang's Settlement Conference Standing Order prior to the Pre-Settlement Planning Conference, particularly the meet and confer requirements for scheduling the Settlement Conference itself. At the Pre-Settlement Planning Conference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss, and the Court will set, the final date for the Settlement Conference. The Pre-Settlement Planning Conference will be held via a non-public Zoom meeting. Appearances by Counsel: All counsel shall provide advance notice to the Court if they will be participating in the Pre-Settlement Planning Conference in order for Court to ensure proper participation in the Zoom meeting. Each Party shall send a list of names of each participating attorney, their email addresses, and Party they are representing to Judge Kang's Courtroom Deputy via email at [LINK:PHKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov] no later than two (2) business days before the Pre-Settlement Planning Conference. Zoom Meeting Access: Information on how to join the Pre-Settlement Planning Conference can be found on Judge Kang's webpage on the Court's website under the subheading Non-Public Hearings [Settlement Conferences] at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/peter-h-kang-phk/] General Order 58: The Court reminds all persons granted access to Court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings from a location outside the Courthouse (including screenshots or other audio or visual copying of a hearing or conference) are prohibited, absent prior written authorization from the Chief Judge. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Zoom Guidance and Setup can be found on the Court's website: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Signed by Judge Peter H. Kang on April 10, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Wed 04/09 8:56 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang for Settlement. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 04/08 1:37 PM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 20 Stipulation Selecting Early Settlement Conference by a Magistrate.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 5 pgs order Order Tue 04/08 1:35 PM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 21 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2025 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Zoom Public Hearing Videoconference Only. Counsel are to email to register for appearances at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov by 7/9/2025.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/08 1:04 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING INITIAL CASE MANAGE CONFERENCE DATES (L.R. 6-1, 6-2) filed by Travis Moreda Dairy, Travis Moreda.(Moore, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alexander Moore in Support
Friday, April 04, 2025
20 20 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/04 2:16 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Selecting ADR Process filed by Travis Moreda. (Moore, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
19 19 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 01/27 5:04 PM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 18 Stipulation AS AMENDED BY THE COURT.Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2025 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 01/27 4:20 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines Set by Court filed by Travis Moreda Dairy.(Moore, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alexander Moore
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
17 17 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 01/22 4:00 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Carlon, William)
Related: [-]
16 16 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 01/22 3:40 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Moore, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/02 11:36 AM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/31 1:31 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Travis Moreda Dairy, Travis Moreda.(Moore, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alexander Moore,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, December 30, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 9:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Civil Penalties by Travis Moreda Dairy, Travis Moreda. (Hsiao, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 11/22 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Peter Hsiao on behalf of Travis Moreda Dairy, Travis Moreda (Hsiao, Peter)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/22 4:28 PM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2025. Initial Case Management Conference CONTINUED TO 2/14/2025 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - PUBLIC HEARING Zoom Webinar Only. Counsel are to email for Zoom appearance by email to sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov by 2/5/2025. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/22 2:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by Travis Moreda Dairy, Travis Moreda.(Moore, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Travis Moreda,
Att: 2 Declaration of Stephanie Moreda-Arend,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Proposed Order
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 11/22 2:43 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Travis Moreda Dairy, Travis Moreda (Moore, Alexander)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 11/22 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Alexander Moore on behalf of Travis Moreda Dairy, Travis Moreda (Moore, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/28 12:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics. Service waived by Travis Moreda waiver sent on 9/26/2024, answer due 11/25/2024; Travis Moreda Dairy waiver sent on 9/26/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (Carlon, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 10/25 9:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Travis Moreda, Travis Moreda Dairy. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Thu 10/24 3:08 PM
Proposed Summons. (Carlon, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 09/23 10:57 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2025 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/23 9:38 AM
Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/23 10:39 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . [err102] NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Brian Darwin Acree and William Leonard Verick- The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 09/20 4:55 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics (Carlon, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/20 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19871583.). Filed by Californians for Alternatives to Toxics.(Carlon, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet