California Central District Court
Judge:Alicia G Rosenberg
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-08122
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 24PSCV02546
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 2:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company
Represented By
John E. Walker
Sacro And Walker LLP
contact info
Larry Mark Golub
Sacro And Walker LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Delia Peralez
Represented By
Nichole Dessie Podgurski
Donahue And Horrow LLP
contact info
Michael B Horrow
Donahue And Horrow LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, March 13, 2025
24 24 order For Order Fri 03/14 2:57 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE23 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: The above-entitled action is dismissed with Prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
23 23 stip Dismiss Case Wed 03/12 4:27 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiff Delia Peralez.(Podgurski, Nichole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 23, 2025
22 22 notice Settlement Thu 01/23 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Delia Peralez. (Horrow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
21 21 6 pgs order Order Wed 12/18 7:25 AM
CIVIL JURY TRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. This matter is set for trial before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. To facilitate the efficient conduct of trial in this matter, counsel shall review carefully the following order and instructions regarding civil jury trials, as well as the court's Scheduling and Case Management Order. (see document for further details.) (et)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 12/18 7:22 AM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. SEE LAST PAGE FOR PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. (See document for further details). (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, December 16, 2024
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form Wed 12/18 7:13 AM
VIDEO SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Case is called. Counsel state their appearances. The court and counsel conferred as stated on the record. Court Reporter: CS 12/16/2024. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
18 18 misc Report Mon 12/09 6:21 PM
Scheduling Conference REPORT filed by Defendant Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company. (Walker, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
17 17 order For Order Wed 12/04 9:57 AM
ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting16 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference. The Zoom scheduling conference previously set for December 9, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. is hereby continued to December 16, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. The parties are to file a scheduling conference statement by December 9, 2024. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
16 16 stip Continue Tue 12/03 5:18 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from December 9, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. to December 16, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. filed by Plaintiff Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company.(Walker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 10/30 7:24 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. On the Court's own motion, the initial status conference scheduled for Monday, December 9, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. PT (Dkt. No.13 ) will be held by video using Zoom webinar. The steps to access the Zoom webinar are available on Judge Rosenberg's Procedures & Schedules page (www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-alicia-g-rosenberg). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lkr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
14 14 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program Tue 10/29 4:56 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 18-11 is approved by District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-08122 AGR. (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
13 13 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 10/28 2:03 PM
ORDER12 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Initial Status Conference is continued to December 9, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
12 12 stip Continue Tue 10/22 3:50 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Initial Status Conference from November 4, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. to December 9, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only8 filed by Plaintiff Delia Peralez.(Horrow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael B. Horrow,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, October 21, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 10/21 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form6(Horrow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Consent to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge
10 10 misc Errata Mon 10/21 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Delia Peralez. correcting Notice of Lodging9 (Horrow, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 10/21 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form6(Horrow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Consent to to Proceed before United States Magistrate Judge
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 09/25 1:56 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 09/25 1:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 09/25 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/20 4:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company identifying Globe Life, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Walker, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 09/20 4:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company. (Walker, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 09/20 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 24PSCV02546 Receipt No: ACACDC-38254534 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company. (Attorney John E. Walker added to party Globe Life And Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Walker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Other Filed Documents
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 09/24 4:30 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Delia Peralez in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/7/2024, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 09/24 4:33 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Delia Peralez in Los Angeles Superior Court on 9/18/2024, attached as Exhibit B.(jtil)
Related: [-]