Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Nathaniel M Gorton
Referred: M Page Kelley
Case #: 1:24-cv-12415
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Joseph Borodawka
Represented By
Thomas G. Wood
City Of Lowell Law Department
contact info
Defendant
City of Lowell
Represented By
Thomas G. Wood
City Of Lowell Law Department
contact info
Defendant
John Doe 1
Represented By
Thomas G. Wood
City Of Lowell Law Department
contact info
Defendant
John Doe 2
Represented By
Thomas G. Wood
City Of Lowell Law Department
contact info
Defendant
John Doe 3
Defendant
William Martir
Represented By
Thomas G. Wood
City Of Lowell Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Janeczak
Defendant
Danny Perrin, Jr.
Represented By
Thomas G. Wood
City Of Lowell Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Scott Sauve
Represented By
Thomas G. Wood
City Of Lowell Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Trani
Represented By
Thomas G. Wood
City Of Lowell Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
DeVante Degree
Represented By
Joshua O'Neill
Boston Defender LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
31 31 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/28 2:49 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley Referred for: Report and Recommendations (rr). Motions referred:19 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (CML)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
30 30 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Thu 04/10 4:55 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Russell, Mark)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/10 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Russell on behalf of Thomas Janeczak (Russell, Mark)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/10 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Moynihan, Jr on behalf of Thomas Janeczak (Moynihan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/10 4:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DeVante Degree. Thomas Janeczak waiver sent on 3/28/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/03 10:11 AM
REPLY to Response to19 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Lowell, Scott Sauve, Danny Perrin, Jr., William Martir, Matthew Trani, Joseph Borodawka. (Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 03/03 9:28 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING limited to 7 pages 24 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (NMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
24 24 motion Leave to File Document Fri 02/28 11:13 AM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Lowell Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 7.1(b)(3) by City of Lowell, Scott Sauve, Danny Perrin, Jr., William Martir, Matthew Trani, Joseph Borodawka.(Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 02/18 10:26 PM
Opposition re19 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DeVante Degree. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/12 11:34 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to19 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 2/18/2025. (NMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/11 11:41 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/18/2025 to File Response/Reply as to19 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DeVante Degree.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
20 20 28 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 01/13 10:22 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re19 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Lowell, Scott Sauve, Danny Perrin, Jr., William Martir, Matthew Trani, Joseph Borodawka.(Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. (Police Report_Redacted)
19 19 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 01/13 10:19 AM
Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Lowell, Scott Sauve, Danny Perrin, Jr., William Martir, Matthew Trani, Joseph Borodawka.(Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 01/10 9:49 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 17 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (NMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
17 17 motion Leave to File Document Thu 01/09 9:48 AM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Oversized Memorandum of Law in Support of Lowell Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint by City of Lowell, Scott Sauve, Danny Perrin, Jr., William Martir, Matthew Trani, Joseph Borodawka.(Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/20 10:18 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joseph Borodawka, City of Lowell, Thomas Janeczak, William Martir, Danny Perrin, Jr., Scott Sauve, Matthew Trani, filed by DeVante Degree.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/05 10:24 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 14 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 27, 2025 to File Response/Reply as to11 Amended Complaint. Responses due by 1/27/2025. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/04 4:47 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 27, 2025 to File Response/Reply as to11 Amended Complaint by City of Lowell, William Martir, Joseph Borodawka.(Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/04 3:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DeVante Degree. Danny Perrin, Jr. waiver sent on 11/27/2024, answer due 1/27/2025; Scott Sauve waiver sent on 11/27/2024, answer due 1/27/2025; Matthew Trani waiver sent on 11/27/2024, answer due 1/27/2025. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/02 10:36 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, in light of the filing of the Amended Complaint (Document No. 11). (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/27 12:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joseph Borodawka, City of Lowell, William Martir, Scott Sauve, Danny Perrin, Jr., Matthew Trani, Thomas Janeczak, filed by DeVante Degree.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
10 10 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 11/25 3:39 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William Martir, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Joseph Borodawka. (Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/25 3:38 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by William Martir, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Joseph Borodawka.(Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
8 8 17 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 11/13 10:34 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Lowell. (Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/13 10:33 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Lowell.(Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/07 4:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DeVante Degree. Joseph Borodawka waiver sent on 9/25/2024, answer due 11/25/2024; William Martir waiver sent on 9/25/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/16 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Wood on behalf of Joseph Borodawka, City of Lowell, William Martir (Wood, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/11 11:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DeVante Degree. City of Lowell waiver sent on 9/25/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 09/23 11:51 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 09/23 8:37 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/20 7:43 PM
COMPLAINT against DeVante Degree Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10611176 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by DeVante Degree.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form Category Form