South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Referred: William Stevens Brown, V
Case #: 8:24-cv-05141
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Terminated:Oct 21, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
15 15 misc Mail Returned Tue 11/19 3:19 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Lakiem Butler. Document Returned:12 Judgment,11 Order on Report and Recommendation, (rweb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
14 14 misc Mail Returned Wed 10/23 2:28 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Lakiem Butler. Document Returned:8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lakiem Butler, 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,6 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer. Looks like Lea County Correctional Facility tried to forward the mail on. The address label we do not use and that is not the postage we use. (rweb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
13 13 misc Document Mailed Mon 10/21 3:54 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED12 Judgment,11 Order on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Lakiem Butler, #841990, Lea County Correctional Facility, 4337 NM 14, Santa Fe, NM 87508. (rweb, )
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Judgment Mon 10/21 3:53 PM
JUDGMENT, dismissed without prejudice. (rweb, )
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Mon 10/21 1:04 PM
ORDER affirming 8 Report and Recommendation, dismissing petition without prejudice ad without requiring respondent to file a return. It is further ordered that a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/21/2024.(eric, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 misc Document Mailed Wed 09/25 3:52 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lakiem Butler, 7 Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,6 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Lakiem Butler #841990, Lea County Correctional Facility, 4337 NM 14, Santa Fe, NM 87508. (rweb, )
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 09/25 3:51 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is recommended that the Petition filed in this case, whether it be deemed a habeas petition or a civil rights claim under 1983, be DISMISSED without prejudice and without requiring the Respondent to file an answer or return. Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 9/25/24. (rweb, )
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/25 3:49 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 9/25/24.(rweb, )
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer Wed 09/25 3:48 PM
ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge William S. Brown on 9/25/24.(rweb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
3 3 misc True Division for Trial Fri 09/20 3:47 PM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (rweb, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/20 3:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by Lakiem Butler. Response to Motion due by 10/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to William Stevens Brown, V.(rweb, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
Att: 1 (Envelope from Jerome Long #151047, Ridgeland Corr Inst, PO Box 2039, Ridgeland, SC 29936)
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 or 2241 Fri 09/20 3:43 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Lakiem Butler.(rweb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 (Envelope from Jerome Long #151047, Ridgeland Corr Inst, PO Box 2039, Ridgeland, SC 29936)