Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-06260
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 12:53 AM MST
Defendant
Keith Frank Petersen (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nathaniel Jacob Walters
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/21/2024 2:33 AM MST
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Keith Frank Petersen (1) count(s) 1-2, 3-5. Initial Appearance, Detention Hearing and Arraignment set for 10/11/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ambri. Defendant's presence is required. Parties are notified of the following proposed dates: Trial: 11/19/2024; Plea Deadline: 11/01/2024. (MYE)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
4 4 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Keith Frank Petersen. (DLC)
Related: [-]