Louisiana Western District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00202
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 2:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Michael W Dole (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Samantha Usher
U S Dept Of Justice Criminal Division
contact info
Kelly Z Walters
U S Dept Of Justice Crim Div Fraud Sec (dc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/21/2024 3:30 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Michael W Dole (1) counts 1, 2-6. (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]
2 2 INDICTMENT WITH SIGNATURE filed under seal as to Michael W Dole (1) (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]
3 3 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET filed under seal as to Michael W Dole (1) (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David J Ayo: GRAND JURY REPORT as to Michael W Dole (1); Open Indictment. Summons to issue. (Court Reporter: LCR, Lafayette-Crtrm 7) (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]
5 5 SUMMONS Issued and filed under seal in case as to Michael W Dole (1). Initial Appearance and Arraignment set for 10/1/2024 10:00 AM in Alexandria, 3rd floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Adams, K)
Related: [-]