Utah District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00932
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 1:42 AM MDT
Defendant
Perry Hunter (1)
Represented By
Emily A. Stirba
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joey Lynn Blanch
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/21/2024 3:13 AM MDT
Thursday, September 19, 2024
1 1 21 pgs Arrest (Rule 5) of Perry Hunter Warrant out of the USDC Central District of California. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett Related [+]
Related: [-] b
Att: 1 2 pgs Arrest Warrant
2 2 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Perry Hunter. Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 9/23/2024 at 11:00 AM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 9/19/2024 Related [+]
Related: [-] b