Montana District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00113
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 1:26 AM MDT
Defendant
Tyrell Forest Anderson (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Zeno B. Baucus
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Billings
contact info
Kelsey Sabol
United States Department Of Justice
contact info

GPO Mar 27 2025
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Tyrell Forest Anderson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/27/2025. (JDH)
GPO Apr 11 2025
ORDER SETTING SENTENCING as to Tyrell Forest Anderson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan's 31 Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea, are ADOPTED IN FULL. Sentencing is set for 7/30/2025 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/11/2025. (EMH)

Docket last updated: 09/21/2024 2:58 AM MDT
Thursday, August 22, 2024
Notification to Counsel of Record as to Tyrell Forest Anderson. Counsel of record has been given sealed access so they may view and e-file documents in the case. TIPS TO REMEMBER You can view a document via the NEF only once. Only the filers login is authorized to view the document. The filing user may not be able to view the document if any secondary e-mail addresses associated with the filing users account tries to open the NEF. NOTE: This case is currently SEALED. Do not allow any documents to be seen by unauthorized persons. (AMC)
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Tyrell Forest Anderson (1) count(s) 1-3, 4-7, 8-9. (AMC)
Related: [-]
2 2 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the1 Indictment (Sealed) as to Tyrell Forest Anderson. (AMC)
Related: [-]
3 3 6 pgs Redacted Indictment as to Tyrell Forest Anderson. (AMC)
Related: [-]