Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:24-cv-01124
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 4:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Employees Retirement System of Texas Trust Fund
Represented By
Yvonne D. Bennett
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Employees Retirement System of Texas
Represented By
Yvonne D. Bennett
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Lauren Honza
Represented By
Yvonne D. Bennett
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
David T. Veal
Represented By
Yvonne D. Bennett
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Porter Wilson
Represented By
Yvonne D. Bennett
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
T.J. Qatato
Represented By
Michael Balcezak
The Melton Law Firm PLLC
contact info
John F. Melton
The Melton Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/30 10:42 AM
Text Order GRANTING21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is ORDERED that Defendants Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Original Complaint is due by May 16, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kklc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/29 2:57 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COMPLAINT by Employees Retirement System of Texas Trust Fund, Employees Retirement System of Texas, Lauren Honza, David T. Veal, Porter Wilson.(Bennett, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
20 20 9 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/24 2:34 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by T.J. Qatato, re16 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Lauren Honza, Defendant Employees Retirement System of Texas Trust Fund, Defendant Porter Wilson, Defendant Employees Retirement System of Texas, Defendant David T. Veal(Melton, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 22 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/22 11:34 AM
Text Order GRANTING19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion toDismiss is now due on or before April 23, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kklc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/21 5:43 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COMPLAINT by T.J. Qatato.(Melton, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 24, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/24 11:25 AM
Text Order GRANTING18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is now due on or before April 21, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kklc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/21 10:24 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COMPLAINT by T.J. Qatato.(Melton, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 21, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/21 9:51 AM
Text Order GRANTING17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss is now due on or before March 21, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kklc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/20 6:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COMPLAINT by T.J. Qatato.(Melton, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
16 16 26 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 01/31 3:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL COMPLAINT by Employees Retirement System of Texas, Employees Retirement System of Texas Trust Fund, Porter Wilson, David T. Veal, Lauren Honza.(Bennett, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order
Friday, December 13, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/13 9:52 AM
Text Order GRANTING15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Dkt. # 15.) It is ORDERED that Defendants Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs First Amended Original Complaint is due by January 31, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kklc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 12/13 12:10 PM
Reset Answer Deadline: Employees Retirement System of Texas Trust Fund answer due 1/31/2025; Employees Retirement System of Texas answer due 1/31/2025; Lauren Honza answer due 1/31/2025; David T. Veal answer due 1/31/2025; Porter Wilson answer due 1/31/2025. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/12 11:52 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 Amended Complaint SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE THEIR RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Employees Retirement System of Texas, Employees Retirement System of Texas Trust Fund, Porter Wilson, David T. Veal, Lauren Honza.(Bennett, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 07, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 11/07 3:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/15 1:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.J. Qatato. Lauren Honza served on 10/7/2024, answer due 12/17/2024. (Melton, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/15 1:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.J. Qatato. David T. Veal served on 9/27/2024, answer due 12/17/2024. (Melton, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/15 1:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.J. Qatato. Porter Wilson served on 9/27/2024, answer due 12/17/2024. (Melton, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/15 1:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.J. Qatato. Employees Retirement System of Texas Trust Fund served on 9/27/2024, answer due 12/17/2024. (Melton, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/15 1:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.J. Qatato. Employees Retirement System of Texas served on 9/27/2024, answer due 12/17/2024. (Melton, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 10/10 10:12 AM
Text Order GRANTING8 Defendant Lauren Honza's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 17, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aclc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 10/11 8:55 AM
Reset Answer Deadline: Lauren Honza answer due 12/17/2024. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/09 11:34 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 Amended Complaint by Lauren Honza.(Bennett, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 07, 2024
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 10/07 9:51 AM
Reset Answer Deadline: Employees Retirement System of Texas Trust Fund answer due 12/17/2024; Employees Retirement System of Texas answer due 12/17/2024; David T. Veal answer due 12/17/2024; and Porter Wilson answer due 12/17/2024. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/04 4:43 PM
Text Order GRANTING7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before December 17, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aclc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 10/03 11:20 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 Amended Complaint by Employees Retirement System of Texas Trust Fund, Employees Retirement System of Texas, David T. Veal, Porter Wilson.(Bennett, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 30, 2024
6 6 115 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/30 1:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by T.J. Qatato.(Melton, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Reissued Mon 09/30 11:44 AM
Summons Reissued as to Lauren Honza. (cnr)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/30 9:25 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by T.J. Qatato. reissue Lauren Honza (Melton, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/24 9:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Employees Retirement System of Texas Trust Fund, Employees Retirement System of Texas, Lauren Honza, David T. Veal, Porter Wilson. (kp)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 22, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sun 09/22 5:46 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by T.J. Qatato.(Melton, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ERS Trust Fund,
Att: 2 Exhibit Wilson,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit Veal,
Att: 4 Exhibit Honza
1 1 116 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 09/22 5:38 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19257733), filed by T.J. Qatato.(Melton, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/24 9:03 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Tue 09/24 9:04 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 09/24 9:04 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by T.J. Qatato. (kp)
Related: [-]