Member Case
Lead case is: 6:24-bk-05079

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lori V Vaughan
Case #: 6:24-bk-05084
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Hawkers Five Points, LLC
54 W Church St Ste 250
Orlando, FL 32801-3469
Represented By
R Scott Shuker
Shuker & Dorris, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Thursday, March 06, 2025
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 03/06 5:07 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Vivianne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
trustee (NO PAPER) - Chapter 11 - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded Thu 10/31 12:20 PM
The United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on 10/31/2024 . Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Kelso, Jill)
Related: [-]
trustee (NO PAPER) - Notice Of Non-Appointment of Creditors' Committee Thu 10/31 12:20 PM
Until further notice, the United States Trustee will not appoint a committee of creditors pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1102. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Kelso, Jill)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
11 11 misc SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules) Wed 10/23 5:09 PM
Schedules A - H, Includes addition or deletion of creditors, or executory contract entity/leaseholders, or co-debtors to Schedules or Change in the Amount or Classification of Debts. Declaration, Summary of Schedules, and Statement of Financial Affairs (Verify Fee) Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Hawkers Five Points, LLC. (Shuker, R)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Wed 10/23 5:39 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)([LINK:6:24-bk-05084-LVV] ) [misc,schaja] ( 34.00). Receipt Number A77243900, Amount Paid $ 34.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Section 341(a) Meeting Thu 10/17 1:39 PM
Notice of Continued Section 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/31/2024 at 10:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. (Kelso, Jill)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
court (NO PAPER) - Notice of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases Tue 10/01 11:26 AM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case with the exception of Lists of Creditors, Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs and any amendments thereto, Proofs of Claim, Ballots (if separate Plans are filed in the jointly administered cases), and Motions for Final Decree, pursuant to Local Rule 1015-1(c)(3). All other papers should be docketed in the lead Case No. 6 24-05079 LVV, Hawkers, LLC Related [+]. (Vivianne)
Related: [-] 5
Sunday, September 29, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 09/30 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Friday, September 27, 2024
8 8 court Certificate of Mailing via BNC (not for re-service of orders and notices) (BK) Fri 09/27 1:38 PM
Certificate of Mailing via Bankruptcy Noticing Center re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Related [+]. (Lee Hue, Karla)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 court 341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline Fri 09/27 1:35 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/17/2024 at 10:00 AM. US Trustee (Orl-Spec) will hold meeting telephonically. Call in No. 888-455-8838 and Passcode 6186101. Proofs of Claims due by 12/2/2024. (Lee Hue, Karla) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2024 (Lee Hue, Karla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 09/26 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #2 )
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
5 5 order Joint Administration Tue 09/24 12:29 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration with Cases: 6:24-bk-04935-LVV; 6:24-bk-04936-LVV; 6:24-bk-04937-LVV; 6:24-bk-04938-LVV; 6:24-bk-04940-LVV; 6:24-bk-05083-LVV; 6:24-bk-05086-LVV; 6:24-bk-05100-LVV; 6:24-bk-05087-LVV; 6:24-bk-05088-LVV; 6:24-bk-05097-LVV; 6:24-bk-05098-LVV; 6:24-bk-05089-LVV; 6:24-bk-05090-LVV; 6:24-bk-05091-LVV; 6:24-bk-05092-LVV; 6:24-bk-05084-LVV; 6:24-bk-05101-LVV; 6:24-bk-05102-LVV; 6:24-bk-05103-LVV; 6:24-bk-05104-LVV; 6:24-bk-05094-LVV; 6:24-bk-05095-LVV; 6:24-bk-05099-LVV; 6:24-bk-05096-LVV; 6:24-bk-05085-LVV; 6:24-bk-05081-LVV; 6:24-bk-05080-LVV. Hawkers, LLC, Case No. 6 24-05079 LVV is Designated as the Lead Case. . This case is associated with lead case 6:24-bk-5079. Related [+]. Service Instructions: R Shuker is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Vivianne)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, September 23, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only) Mon 09/23 2:52 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Jill E Kelso on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Kelso, Jill)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Motion for Joint Administration Mon 09/23 1:17 PM
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs order Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business Mon 09/23 10:59 AM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 09/23 9:43 AM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). List of Creditors Holding the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims, Declaration, List of Equity Security Holders, Verification of Creditor Matrix, and Creditor Matrix Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Hawkers Five Points, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/21/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 01/21/2025. (Shuker, R)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Mon 09/23 9:50 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:24-bk-05084] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A76913685, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
assign Assign Judge to Electronically Filed Cases Mon 09/23 10:51 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Lori V. Vaughan, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Kathy D.)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Mon 09/23 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]