Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:William I Arbuckle
Case #: 1:24-cv-01604
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2024
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 10:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By
Michael P. Trainor
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Wattie-Bey
1926 Paxton Street Apt. 2
Harrisburg, PA 17104


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, December 05, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/05 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal by David Wattie-Bey. (ea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (60 Day Settlement Order) Tue 11/19 10:33 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated - it is ORDERED that: (1) All deadlines in this action are STAYED; (2) Any pending Motions are DENIED as MOOT; (3) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mark this matter CLOSED for administrative purposes only; (4) The parties are DIRECTED to file an appropriate stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), which specifies whether the dismissal will be with or without prejudice; (5) Either party may file a notice to reinstate this action if the settlement is not consummated within sixty days of this order, provided that such notice is filed no later than 1/20/2025; and (6) If the parties fail to timely file a stipulation of dismissal or notice to reinstate this action within the sixty days, this order shall operate as a voluntary dismissal with prejudice, based on the parties' aforementioned notice of settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 11/19/2024. (caw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 11/07 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Trainor on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Trainor, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 11/07 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Trainor, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Tue 09/24 9:50 AM
Receipt of payment from DAVID WATTIE in the amount of $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA-PIF/Non-IFP. Transaction posted on 9/23/2024. Receipt number 111102706 processed by SH. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
4 4 misc Filing Fee Received - Complaint is now deemed Filed Mon 09/23 12:05 PM
Filing fee: $405, receipt number 111102706. Complaint is now deemed FILED. (ea)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pro Se Letter issued - MJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Mon 09/23 10:44 AM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (ea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/23 10:39 AM
Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s) in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/23 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed by David Wattie-Bey. (Filing fee received in Harrisburg Clerk's Office, receipt forthcoming.) (ea) Modified on 9/23/2024 (ea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Pre-Legal Notification,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Letter in Response to Email Notice