Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Joseph F Saporito, Jr
Case #: 3:24-cv-01603
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 10:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Ty C. Moon
Represented By
Jacob Frasch
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Timothy D. Schaeffer
Represented By
Jacob Frasch
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy D. Thomas
Represented By
Kirby Thomas West
Institute For Justice
contact info
Dylan Moore
Institute For Justice
contact info
Douglas P. Thomas
Thomas & Pinnacoli Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Mediator
Terminated: 01/27/2025
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Barrett
Office Of Clerk Of Court
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Mon 02/24 2:26 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery due 120 days after disposition of Doc. 12 motion to dismiss; See Order for complete deadlines. Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 2/24/25 (ms)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time Fri 02/21 10:54 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Timothy D. Schaeffer, Ty C. Moon.(Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 27, 2025
25 25 misc Report of Mediator (Settlement Not Reached) Mon 01/27 11:52 AM
REPORT OF MEDIATOR (Settlement Not Reached). (joeb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
24 24 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Thu 01/09 10:49 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Timothy D. Schaeffer, Ty C. Moon.(Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
23 23 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 12/19 4:59 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Joseph Anthony Barrett,Joseph Anthony Barrett for Mediator added. Report of mediator due 2/19/25 Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 12/19/24. (ms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 12/18 3:27 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Extend Time to file reply brief. Reply brief to Doc. 12 motion to dismiss due 1/10/25. Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 12/18/24 (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time Tue 12/17 9:19 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend the Deadline By Which They Must File a Reply Brief by Timothy D. Schaeffer, Ty C. Moon.(Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 13, 2024
20 20 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Fri 12/13 2:27 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Timothy D. Thomas.(Moore, Dylan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 02, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/02 2:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2025. Discovery due by 3/24/2025. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 2/19/2025. Defendant Expert Report is due by 3/21/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2025. Motions due by 4/23/2025. Supplemental due by 4/21/2025. Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 12/2/24. (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
17 17 misc Case Management Plan Tue 11/26 11:21 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Timothy D. Thomas. (West, Kirby)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 11/21 1:29 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Extend Time to respond to Doc. 12 motion to dismiss. Brief in opposition due 12/13/24 Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 11/21/24 (ms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/20 4:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Timothy D. Thomas.(West, Kirby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/20 3:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2024 10:00 AM before District Judge Joseph F Saporito Jr.. Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 11/20/24. (ms)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
13 13 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Fri 11/15 3:25 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Timothy D. Schaeffer, Ty C. Moon.(Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 11/15 3:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Timothy D. Schaeffer, Ty C. Moon.(Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 10, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 10/10 5:13 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint All Defendants. Answer due 11/15/24. Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 10/10/24 (ms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/09 12:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Ty C. Moon, Timothy D. Schaeffer.(Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 10/09 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Frasch on behalf of Ty C. Moon, Timothy D. Schaeffer (Frasch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/01 12:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy D. Thomas. Ty C. Moon served on 9/25/2024, answer due 10/16/2024. (West, Kirby)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/01 12:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy D. Thomas. Timothy D. Schaeffer served on 9/25/2024, answer due 10/16/2024. (West, Kirby)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
6 6 order Special Admissions Form Approved Wed 09/25 4:46 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Dylan Moore Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 9/25/24. (ms)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Special Admissions Form Approved Wed 09/25 4:43 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kirby West Signed by District Judge Joseph F Saporito, Jr on 9/25/24. (ms)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
4 4 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/23 5:08 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Dylan Moore on behalf of Timothy D. Thomas Attorney Dylan Moore is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6765153.. (Moore, Dylan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/23 4:58 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kirby Thomas West on behalf of Timothy D. Thomas Attorney Kirby West is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6765127.. (West, Kirby)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/23 9:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Ty C. Moon, Timothy D. Schaeffer and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (dj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
Sunday, September 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/23 9:31 AM
COMPLAINT against Ty C. Moon, Timothy D. Schaeffer ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6763586), filed by Timothy D. Thomas.(dj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet