Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Nathaniel M Gorton
Case #: 1:24-cv-12420
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 9:36 AM EDT
Defendant
City of Brockton
Represented By
Stacey Klein Verde
City Of Brockton
contact info
Defendant
David Luu
Represented By
Stacey Klein Verde
City Of Brockton
contact info
Defendant
COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Defendant
Ali Jaafar
Plaintiff
Narine Ramhit
Represented By
Joshua O'Neill
Boston Defender LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 01/21 9:45 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Narine Ramhit responses due by 3/28/2025. (NMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/17 9:53 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Friday, March 28, 2025, to File Response/Reply by Narine Ramhit.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, December 30, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 12/30 2:03 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Friday, January 17, 2025 to Respond to Brockton Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/17/2025. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time Thu 12/26 3:21 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Friday, January 17, 2025 to Respond to Brockton Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Narine Ramhit.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
9 9 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 12/12 10:54 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Brockton. (Verde, Stacey)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 12/12 10:53 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Brockton.(Verde, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/05 7:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Brockton, David Luu, Ali Jaafar, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, filed by Narine Ramhit.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
6 6 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 11/21 11:54 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Brockton, David Luu. (Verde, Stacey)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 11/21 11:53 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Brockton, David Luu.(Verde, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/11 11:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Narine Ramhit. All Defendants. (O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/24 1:56 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Brockton, David Luu. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 09/24 11:12 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Martin, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/23 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10613365 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Narine Ramhit.(O'Neill, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form