Head v. City of Sioux Falls et al
South Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Roberto A Lange |
Referred: | Mark A Moreno |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04175 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 4:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
City of Sioux Falls
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Catherine Schlimgen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Judge Wade Warntjes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Judge Robin Houwman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Judge John R. Pekas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce E Head
1300 S Olive Dr
Sioux Falls, SD 57103 |
|
Plaintiff
Michele J Head
1300 S Olive Dr
Sioux Falls, SD 57103 |
Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
![]() REQUEST to Appeal to the Supreme Court by Plaintiffs Bruce E Head, Michele J Head. (AKW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
34 | 34
![]() OBJECTION to31 Report and Recommendation by Bruce E Head, Michele J Head. (AKW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 13, 2025 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ORDER granting32 Motion to Seal Document; and granting32 Motion to Extend Deadlines (Objections to R&R due by 4/1/2025.). Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 03/13/2025. (AKW) Modified on 3/13/2025: Mailed copy to Michele via USPS. (AKW) |
|
Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() MOTION to Extend Deadlines, MOTION to Seal Document by Bruce E Head. (Plaintiff did not include a separate motion to seal the exhibit attached to this motion to extend, but noted across the top "Judges eyes only please") (JLS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re22 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) on behalf of Defendants City of Sioux Falls and Catherine Schlimgen Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Mark A. Moreno on 3/4/2025. (SF) Modified on 3/4/2025 cc: mailed to Michele Head via USPS (KLE) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re22 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) on behalf of Defendants City of Sioux Falls and Catherine Schlimgen and Motion to Stay Discovery filed by City of Sioux Falls, Catherine Schlimgen. (Jelen, Melissa) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2025 | ||
29 | 29
![]() ORDER denying28 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 02/13/2025. (RMM) Modified on 2/14/2025 to add mailing information - copy of Order mailed to Michele Head via USPS (RMM) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
![]() MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bruce E Head. (AKW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ORDER REFERRING MOTION:12 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by John R. Pekas, Judge Wade Warntjes, Robin Houwman, 22 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) on behalf of Defendants City of Sioux Falls and Catherine Schlimgen filed by City of Sioux Falls, Catherine Schlimgen. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 02/10/2025. Motions referred to Mark A. Moreno.(AKW) Modified on 2/10/2025 to send copy via USPS mail to Michele Head (AKW) |
|
Friday, February 07, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, and 22 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) on behalf of Defendants City of Sioux Falls and Catherine Schlimgen filed by Bruce E Head. (AKW) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION for Discovery filed by Robin Houwman, John R. Pekas, Judge Wade Warntjes. (Anderson, Robert) |
|
Monday, February 03, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() MOTION for Discovery by Bruce E Head. (AKW) |
|
Friday, January 24, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re22 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) on behalf of Defendants City of Sioux Falls and Catherine Schlimgen filed by City of Sioux Falls, Catherine Schlimgen. (Jelen, Melissa) |
|
22 | 22
![]() MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) on behalf of Defendants City of Sioux Falls and Catherine Schlimgen by City of Sioux Falls, Catherine Schlimgen. (Jelen, Melissa) |
|
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa R. Jelen on behalf of City of Sioux Falls, Catherine Schlimgen. (Jelen, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, January 23, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bruce E Head. Catherine Schlimgen served on 1/22/2025, answer due 2/12/2025. (AKW) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER giving Notice of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Service of summons and complaint must be made by 2/14/2025 on Defendants Schlimgen and the City of Sioux Falls. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 1/14/2025. (Mailed to Michele Head)(JLS) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() RESPONSE to12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bruce E Head. (RMM) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() REPLY to Motion Response re12 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by John R. Pekas, Robin Houwman, Judge Wade Warntjes. (Anderson, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bruce E Head. (AKW) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() LETTERS Received from Bruce E. Head to Judge Roberto A. Lange. (AKW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
misc
Received
Fri 10/18 2:14 PM
RECEIVED Jump Drive containing Exhibits 1 & 2 to Doc.14 . Placed in SF Clerk's Vault. (RMM) |
||
Wednesday, October 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() AFFIDAVIT in Support re12 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robin Houwman, John R. Pekas, Judge Wade Warntjes. (Anderson, Robert) |
|
13 | 13
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robin Houwman, John R. Pekas, Judge Wade Warntjes. (Anderson, Robert) |
|
12 | 12
![]() MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Robin Houwman, John R. Pekas, Judge Wade Warntjes. (Anderson, Robert) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE as to Robin Houwman, Judge Wade Warntjes. (AKW) |
|
10 | 10
![]() LETTER Received from Bruce Head to Judge Lange. (AKW) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of Robin Houwman, John R. Pekas, Judge Wade Warntjes. (Anderson, Robert) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Summons Issued as to Robin Houwman, John R. Pekas, Catherine Schlimgen, Judge Wade Warntjes. 4 Summons(es) delivered via hand delivery to Pro Se Plaintiff with blank AO85 form CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: [LINK:National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (SLT) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Jury Demand and Letter by Bruce E Head. (SLT) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Service LETTER with enclosed (3) Summons and AO 85 form sent by Clerk's Office to Bruce E Head. (JMS) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
New Case Letter - Nonprisoner Case
Tue 09/24 9:40 AM
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee and incorrectly completed summons(es) or no summons(es). A new case has been opened. We are unable to issue summon(es) at this time. Enclosed is a blank summons form and a sample completed summons form. Follow the enclosed instructions to properly complete your summons(es). As soon as the Clerks Office receives your properly completed summons(es), it/they will be issued. Copy of docket sheet, blank summons form, and sample completed summons form with instructions sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2, you must redact personal identifiers from documents submitted to the Court. The Clerks Office will not review for compliance. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (JMS) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Bruce E Head. Pro se party Bruce E Head will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (JMS) |
|
2 | 2
![]() RECEIPT for Civil Filing Fee (JMS) Modified on 9/24/2024 to correct date filed. (JMS) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT, $405 fee paid, receipt# 400003945, filed by Bruce E Head. (JMS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |