Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-05172
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2024
Case in other court:New York Southern, 7:24-cv-05967
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 18, 2025 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Represented By
Thomas John Herten
Archer & Greiner P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By
Thomas John Herten
Archer & Greiner P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Plaintiff
LE-AX Regional Water District
Represented By
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Nicholas H Mindicino
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/29 3:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BASF Corporation.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 25, 2025
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/25 3:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 10/02 3:38 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
6 6 misc MDL Member Case Opened Mon 09/23 1:32 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 7:24-cv-05967, LE-AX Regional Water District v. AGC Chemicals Americas Inc. et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-05172-RMG (jbin)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 09/23 1:26 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:24-cv-05967. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
4 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER (CTO 212) FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 9/17/2024) (tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/23/2024.]
Related: [-]
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/23/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/23/2024.]
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/23/2024.]
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/23/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on All Parties on 8/6/2024. Document filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company)..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/23/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/23/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 59229/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29711900).Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company), Chemguard Inc...(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/23/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NY State Court Complaint