Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:24-cv-02313
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 12:35 PM CDT
Defendant
Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By
Thomas J. McGoey, II
Liskow & Lewis (new Orleans)
contact info
Ellen Durel George
Liskow & Lewis, Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Danos L.L.C.
Represented By
Paige Hotard Franckiewicz
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
James P. Waldron
Adams And Reese
contact info
Lauren Lopresto Tafaro
Adams & Reese, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ernest Cox
Represented By
Christopher Minias
The Minias Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 03/28 10:35 PM
STATUS REPORT on behalf of all parties by Danos L.L.C. (Franckiewicz, Paige)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/18 9:45 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (McGoey, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
22 22 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 02/12 10:37 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Ernest Cox re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Minias, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
21 21 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/11 10:34 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Ernest Cox re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Minias, Christopher)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/11 12:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 11/17/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2026 04:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Jury Trial set for 2/2/2026 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk.(mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form,
Att: 2 Standing Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 01/31 1:57 PM
NOTICE: Scheduling Conference RESET for 2/11/2025 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Call-in instructions provided herein. Issued by Clerk. (mp)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/31 1:01 PM
ORDER granting16 MOTION to Reset the Submission Deadline. The new submission date for the14 Motion to Dismiss will be February 19, 2025. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on January 31, 2025.(mp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
17 17 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Thu 01/30 9:14 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (McGoey, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 26, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Deadlines Sun 01/26 10:21 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Ernest Cox.(Minias, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 01/21 6:57 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Danos L.L.C..(Franckiewicz, Paige)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Tue 01/21 11:41 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/5/2025.(McGoey, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/07 8:53 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Withdraw Pending Motion to Dismiss and to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline for Amended Complaint. Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s7 Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against It is withdrawn from the record in the above-captioned matter. The deadline for defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Danos, L.L.C. to file responsive pleadings to Mr. Cox's amended complaint is continued from December 27, 2024, to January 21, 2025. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on January 6, 2025. (mp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/23 2:34 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to withdraw pending motion to dismiss and to continue responsive pleading deadline for amended complaint by Chevron U.S.A. Inc..(McGoey, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 13, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/13 9:29 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Ernest Cox.(Minias, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/13 1:20 PM
NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2025 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. Call-in instructions provided herein. Issued by Clerk. (mp)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 12/13 9:35 AM
ORDER granting8 Unopposed Motion to Reset the Submission Deadline. The submission date for Defendant Chevron U.S.A., Inc.'s7 Motion to Dismiss is continued from December 11, 2024 to January 8, 2025. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on December 13, 2024.(mp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/05 11:30 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ernest Cox.(Minias, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 22, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Fri 11/22 1:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/11/2024.Attorney Thomas J. McGoey, II added to party Chevron U.S.A. Inc.(pty:dft).(McGoey, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, November 11, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/11 4:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Danos, L.L.C..(Tafaro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/25 1:35 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2024. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to Answer Mon 10/21 1:03 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by Danos, L.L.C..Attorney Lauren Lopresto Tafaro added to party Danos, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Tafaro, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 30, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/30 4:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Chevron U.S.A. Inc. on 9/23/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (Minias, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 09/24 8:06 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/23 10:08 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10702678) filed by Ernest Cox.Attorney Christopher Minias added to party Ernest Cox(pty:pla).(Minias, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A- EEOC Charge,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Right to Sue,
Att: 4 Summons