Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:24-cv-00902
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 5:29 AM CDT
Defendant
United Airlines Inc.
Represented By
Donald J Munro
Jones Day
contact info
Russell D Cawyer
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Taylor J Winn
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Alexander V Maugeri
Jones Day
contact info
Jordan M Matthews
Jones Day - Chicago
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracy Brown et al
Represented By
John Clay Sullivan
S|l Law PLLC
contact info
Jace Randall Yarbrough
S|l Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 04/01 8:09 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is the Plaintiffs'12 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of Class Certification Appeal in Related Case. The Court is of the opinion that Plaintiffs' Motion should be GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/31/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Tue 04/01 8:10 AM
Civil Case Administratively Closed per17 ORDER. (mmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
16 16 respm Reply Mon 03/17 11:37 PM
REPLY filed by Tracy Brown et al re:12 MOTION to Stay Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of Class Certification Appeal in Related Case (Sullivan, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
15 15 respm Response/Objection Mon 03/03 1:46 PM
RESPONSE filed by United Airlines Inc. re:12 MOTION to Stay Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of Class Certification Appeal in Related Case (Cawyer, Russell)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Fri 02/28 9:46 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Unopposed13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's7 Motion to Dismiss and9 Motion to Transfer Venue. The Court finds that the Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs' deadline to respond is extended up to and including April 3, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/28/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time Thu 02/27 11:38 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motions filed by Tracy Brown et al (Sullivan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
12 12 3 pgs motion Stay Tue 02/11 10:53 PM
MOTION to Stay Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of Class Certification Appeal in Related Case filed by Tracy Brown et al (Sullivan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
11 11 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 02/11 8:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Airlines Inc.. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Cawyer, Russell)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Appendix in Support Tue 02/11 7:59 PM
Appendix in Support filed by United Airlines Inc. re9 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Defendants Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of Illinois (Cawyer, Russell)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Transfer Case Out of District/Division Tue 02/11 7:57 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Defendants Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of Illinois filed by United Airlines Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Cawyer, Russell)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Appendix in Support Tue 02/11 7:54 PM
Appendix in Support filed by United Airlines Inc. re7 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(B)(2), 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Brief in Support (Cawyer, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-E-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E-3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F-1,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F-2,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F-3
7 7 motion Dismiss Tue 02/11 7:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(B)(2), 12(B)(3) and 12(B)(6) and Brief in Support filed by United Airlines Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Russell D Cawyer added to party United Airlines Inc.(pty:dft) (Cawyer, Russell)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/10 11:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against United Airlines Inc. filed by Tracy Brown et al. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sullivan, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Returned Fri 12/20 5:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to United Airlines Inc.. Waiver sent on 12/20/2024. (Sullivan, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 09/24 10:03 AM
Summons Issued as to United Airlines Inc. (mmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
3 3 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Tue 09/24 9:59 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Mon 09/23 9:52 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff Tracy Brown. (Sullivan, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 685 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/23 9:07 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against United Airlines Incorporated filed by Tracy Brown. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14939453) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sullivan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet