Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Morrissey
Case #: 2:24-cv-02519
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 1:59 AM MST
Defendant
Tempe, City of
Represented By
Matthew Mansfield
City Of Tempe, City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Sarah Roshanne Anchors
Tempe City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Eric C Anderson
Tempe City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Bartel
Represented By
Christina Locher
contact info
Anjali J Patel
Tyler Allen Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
27 27 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Tue 05/20 1:24 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Steven Bartel. (Patel, Anjali)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
26 26 misc Reply Tue 05/06 9:56 AM
*ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by Defendant Tempe, City of. (Anchors, Sarah) *Modified from reply to answer on 5/6/2025 (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
25 25 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/23 12:23 PM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2025 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 4/23/25. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
24 24 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims Tue 04/22 11:33 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part17 Motion to Dismiss as set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 4/21/25. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
23 23 misc Reply Thu 12/26 3:10 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counts I and II of the Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Tempe, City of. (Mansfield, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
misc 25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge Thu 12/19 12:16 PM
Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
19 19 respm Response to Motion Wed 12/18 10:56 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:17 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : I & II of SAC filed by Steven Bartel.(Patel, Anjali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Steven Barte,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Tyler K. Allen,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit of Chris Wisniewski
misc 25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 12/19 12:15 PM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
18 18 misc 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline Thu 12/05 7:03 AM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
17 17 motion Dismiss Counts/Claims Wed 12/04 4:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : I & II of SAC by Tempe, City of.(Anchors, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 12/04 3:54 PM
Partial ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint Count III by Tempe, City of.(Anchors, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/25 3:08 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Proof of Service of Process by Steven Bartel .(Patel, Anjali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 11/25 2:25 PM
*Entry filed in the incorrect case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 11/25/2024 (SCH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) Wed 11/20 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Steven Bartel .(Patel, Anjali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/20 3:12 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tempe, City of filed by Steven Bartel.(Patel, Anjali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Monday, October 28, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/28 4:53 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven Bartel filed by Steven Bartel.(Patel, Anjali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint Exhibit B
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
10 10 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Wed 10/09 9:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER: That the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for November 12, 2024 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
9 9 misc 25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 10/09 9:04 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b)) Tue 10/08 9:31 AM
AMENDED ORDER that Steven Bartel show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge John J Tuchi. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
6 6 misc 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b)) Tue 10/08 9:26 AM
*AMENDED By Doc.7 *ORDER that Steven Bartel show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge John J Tuchi. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi.(MAP) *Modified on 10/8/2024 (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Monday, September 30, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 09/30 6:39 AM
Summons Issued as to Tempe, City of. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
4 4 service Summons Submitted Fri 09/27 3:50 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Steven Bartel. (Patel, Anjali)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
3 3 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Mon 09/23 11:58 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Steven Bartel. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Attorney must update PACER account to match law firm information on pleading: Christina Marie Locher . Law firm name listed on pleading: Tyler Allen Law Firm PLLC . Law firm in CM-ECF Account: Koeller Nebeker Carlson & Haluck LLP . Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
2 2 misc New Case Opened Mon 09/23 11:55 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23487121. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-02519 PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/23 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23487121 filed by Steven Bartel. (submitted by Anjali Patel)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet