Montana District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00054
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2024 1:19 AM MDT
Defendant
Seth Robert Abbott (1)
Represented By
Rebekah Hall
Palisade Legal, PLLC
contact info
R. Hank Branom
Federal Defenders Of Montana - Great Falls
contact info
Defendant
Heather Nichole Schneider (2)
Represented By
Clark Mathews
Federal Defenders Of Montana
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ryan G. Weldon
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/24/2024 1:29 AM MDT
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
Notification to Counsel of Record as to Seth Robert Abbott, Heather Nichole Schneider. Counsel of record has been given sealed access so they may view and e-file documents in the case. TIPS TO REMEMBER You can view a document via the NEF only once. Only the filers login is authorized to view the document. The filing user may not be able to view the document if any secondary e-mail addresses associated with the filing users account tries to open the NEF. NOTE: This case is currently SEALED. Do not allow any documents to be seen by unauthorized persons.
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Seth Robert Abbott (1) count(s) 1, 2-10, 11-19, Heather Nichole Schneider (2) count(s) 1, 2-10, 11-19. (TLO)
Related: [-]
2 2 Redacted Indictment as to Seth Robert Abbott, Heather Nichole Schneider. (TLO) Modified on 6/28/2024 to correct filed date (SAJ).
Related: [-]
3 3 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the1 Indictment (Sealed) as to Seth Robert Abbott. (TLO)
Related: [-]
4 4 Criminal Cover Sheet filed by USA regarding the1 Indictment (Sealed) as to Heather Nichole Schneider. (TLO)
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued (Sealed) by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto in case as to Seth Robert Abbott. (TLO)
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant Issued (Sealed) by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto in case as to Heather Nichole Schneider. (TLO)
Related: [-]