New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:24-cv-09379
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 9:41 AM EDT
Defendant
PARTY CITY HOLDINGS INC.
Represented By
BRANDON REED SHER
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Notice Only
PHV EZRA SALAMI
Plaintiff
SONIA AGOSTINO
Represented By
ROBERT B. DAVIS
Davis Law Center, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 01/16 12:26 PM
TEXT ORDER: Administratively terminating14 Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/16/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
21 21 order Text Order Wed 01/08 4:50 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant Party City Holdings Inc.'s Notice of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy dated January 6, 2025 at ECF No.20 , which advises as to Defendant's voluntary bankruptcy petition for relief under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code, 11 U.S.C. §§ 101 et seq., filed December 21, 2024 in the Southern District of Texas. In light of its bankruptcy petition, Defendant requests the Court enter an automatic stay of this matter until the bankruptcy proceedings are resolved pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(a). Defendant's request is GRANTED. This matter is hereby STAYED pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(a). As such, the January 29, 2025 Initial Scheduling Conference is CANCELED and will be promptly rescheduled once the stay of this matter is lifted. Defendant is ORDERED to advise as to the status of the bankruptcy proceedings on or before July 8, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/8/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
20 20 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Mon 01/06 11:55 AM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by PARTY CITY HOLDINGS INC..(WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Voluntary Petition of Party City Holdco Inc.
19 19 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 01/06 10:34 AM
LETTER ORDER Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1. On 1/29/2025 at 3:30 PM there shall be an Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. The conference will be held telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/6/2025. (wh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 11/27 5:50 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by PARTY CITY HOLDINGS INC. re14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's NJ Warn Act Claim (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/25 12:18 PM
LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's16 Letter requesting a two-day extension of time to file their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/25/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Fri 11/22 2:21 PM
Letter from Michael Westwood-Booth, Esq.. (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
qc QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney Thu 11/21 10:07 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition submitted by ROBERT DAVIS on 11/20/2024 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. This document contains an s/ signature for Attorney Ezra Salami, admitted Pro Hac Vice. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE SIGNATURE PAGE OF THE MEMORANDUM WITH THE PROPER WET/SCANNED SIGNATURE OF EZRA SALAMI USING THE EVENT "EXHIBIT TO DOCUMENT", TYING IT BACK INTO THE15 MEMORANDUM. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (wh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
15 15 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Wed 11/20 5:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SONIA AGOSTINO re14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's NJ Warn Act Claim (DAVIS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Party City's New Jersey State Certificate of Authority,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Copy of Severance Agreement w/ addendum
Friday, November 01, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 11/01 9:55 AM
Set Deadlines as to14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's NJ Warn Act Claim. Motion set for 12/2/2024 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
14 14 3 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 10/31 3:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's NJ Warn Act Claim by PARTY CITY HOLDINGS INC..(WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 19 pgs Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Certification of Michael Westwood-Booth, Esq. i/s/o Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit A - Temporary Cert of Occupancy,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit B - Final Cert of Occupancy,
Att: 5 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Wed 10/09 9:53 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, EZRA SALAMI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (wh)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 10/09 9:57 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The11 Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by PARTY CITY HOLDINGS INC. on 10/08/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/31/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Tue 10/08 3:00 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice EZRA SALAMI to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15724198.) (DAVIS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 10/08 11:54 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PARTY CITY HOLDINGS INC. identifying Party City Holdco Inc as Corporate Parent.. (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 10/08 11:43 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Party City Holdings Inc... (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/08 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON REED SHER on behalf of PARTY CITY HOLDINGS INC. (SHER, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/08 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JOSEPH WESTWOOD-BOOTH on behalf of PARTY CITY HOLDINGS INC. (WESTWOOD-BOOTH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
8 8 order Text Order Mon 10/07 5:31 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's motion to admit Ezra Salamipro hac vice ("the Motion"). ECF No.3 . Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED provisionally pursuant to the accompanying Order at ECF No.7 . If Defendant Party City Holdings Inc. appears in the matter, Plaintiff shall contact the appropriate counsel for consent within two weeks of Defendant's appearance. In the event Defendant does not consent, Defendant shall file its opposition to the Motion within two weeks of its appearance. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 10/7/2024. (akw, )
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/07 3:50 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of EZRA SALAMI. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 10/7/2024. (wh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Thu 10/03 9:12 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The6 Summons Returned Executed filed by ROBERT DAVIS on 10/01/2024 was submitted incorrectly as an Affidavits of Service. For future reference, if filing a Return of Service or Affidavit of Service indicating the date of service of the Summons and the Complaint, please refer to the event "Summons Returned Executed" (or "Summons Returned Executed as to USA", when applicable). (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/01 3:22 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service on 9/26/2024, filed by SONIA AGOSTINO. (DAVIS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
5 5 misc Exhibit (to Document) Thu 09/26 5:40 AM
Exhibit to3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (DAVIS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 09/25 10:45 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PARTY CITY HOLDINGS INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney Wed 09/25 10:51 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ezra Salami submitted by ROBERT DAVIS on 9/24/2024 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. This document contains an s/ signature for Attorney Ezra Salami, applying for admission Pro Hac Vice. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE SIGNATURE PAGE OF EZRA SALAMI'S CERTIFICATION WITH A PROPER WET/SCANNED SIGNATURE USING THE EVENT "EXHIBIT TO DOCUMENT", TYING IT BACK INTO THE3 MOTION. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (wh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/25 10:51 AM
Set Deadlines as to3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ezra Salami. Motion set for 10/21/2024 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/24 10:48 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ezra Salami by SONIA AGOSTINO.(DAVIS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Robert Davis,
Att: 2 Certification Ezra Salami,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Tue 09/24 6:45 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by SONIA AGOSTINO as to PARTY CITY HOLDCO INC.. (DAVIS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/24 9:02 AM
COMPLAINT against PARTY CITY HOLDCO INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15685524) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SONIA AGOSTINO.(DAVIS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/24 2:06 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (ak, )
Related: [-]