Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Case #: 0:24-cv-61765
Nature of Suit423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157
Cause28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Terminated:Nov 18, 2024
Case in other court:USBC-FTL, 24-01089-PDR
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Karim Hanna
Represented By
Jose Alfredo Avila
Jun Avila PLLC
contact info
James David Silver
Kelley Kronenberg
contact info
Interested Party
Noticing Bankruptcy Court
Plaintiff
Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper
Represented By
Gregory Stewart Grossman
Sequor Law, PA
contact info
Maria Jose Cortesi
Sequor Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, November 18, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 11/18 3:44 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED the Motion [ECF No.1 ] is DENIED AS MOOT and this matter is DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Closing Case. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 11/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/18 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Filing Order and Suggestion of Mootness by Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper (Grossman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order to Vacate Fri 09/27 1:17 PM
Order: Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the ECF No.6 ,7 is VACATED IN PART to the extent that it consolidated the two cases. All pleadings hereinafter filed shall bear the case number, Case No. 0:24-cv-61765 for Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Copper v. Karim Hanna. Judge Leibowitz shall continue to preside over Case No. 0:24-cv-61765. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 9/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks Thu 09/26 3:27 PM
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re6 Order. Document Restricted Due to Error ; The correct document has been re-docketed at DE7 . (wce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Reassigning/Transferring Case Thu 09/26 3:23 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER: TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge David S. Leibowitz for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 9/25/2024. It is: ORDERED that all pleadings hereinafter filed shall bear the following case number, Case No. 24-cv-61762-DSL, thereby indicating the Judge to whom all pleadings should be routed or otherwise brought for attention. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 09/26 1:29 PM
(DOCKETED IN ERROR) ORDER OF TRANSFER: TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge David S. Leibowitz for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 9/25/2024. It is: ORDERED that all pleadings hereinafter filed shall bear the following case number, Case No. 24-cv-61762-DSL, thereby indicating the Judge to whom all pleadings should be routed or otherwise brought for attention. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/25/2024. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 0:24-cv-61762-DSL, 0:24-cv-61765-WPD (wce) Modified Text on 9/26/2024 (wce)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association Thu 09/26 12:35 PM
Cases associated. (wce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Tue 09/24 3:26 PM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Chavonnes Badenhorst St Clair Cooper (Grossman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Bankruptcy Filing of Notice of Appeal with District Court Tue 09/24 10:44 AM
Bankruptcy Filing of Motion to Withdraw Reference Pursuant to 28 USC 157(d) with District Court (jc)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 09/24 10:44 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court Tue 09/24 10:24 AM
Bankruptcy Transmittal of re1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) to Withdraw Reference filed by Karim Hanna(mfe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation,
Att: 2 Response,
Att: 3 Reply,
Att: 4 Docket Sheet
1 1 3 pgs cmp Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) to Withdraw Reference - CV - NO FEE Tue 09/24 10:23 AM
MOTION (COMPLAINT) to Withdraw Reference Bankruptcy Court case number 24-01089 PDR., filed by Karim Hanna.(mfe)
Related: [-]