Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Referred: Brian Mckay
Case #: 3:24-cv-02408
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 5:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Pocketstop LLC
Represented By
Neil J McNabnay
Fish & Richardson
contact info
David B Conrad
Fish & Richardson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Verna IP Holdings LLC
Represented By
William P Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
25 25 respm Reply Wed 04/30 4:38 PM
REPLY filed by Pocketstop LLC re:18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Conrad, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/28 10:18 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting23 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Reply due no later than April 30, 2025. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 4/28/2025)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/23 3:38 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pocketstop LLC (Conrad, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
22 22 3 pgs answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 04/16 2:16 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Verna IP Holdings LLC. Related document:19 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
21 21 23 pgs respm Response/Objection Wed 04/09 5:01 PM
RESPONSE filed by Verna IP Holdings LLC re:18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
20 20 2 pgs misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 03/26 4:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pocketstop LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 03/26 4:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Pocketstop LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Verna IP Holdings LLC filed by Pocketstop LLC (McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 03/26 3:59 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pocketstop LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/05 8:45 AM
STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Brian McKay for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 3/4/2025) (agc) Modified docket text (mcrd)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/05 8:42 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Waiver of the Local Counsel Requirement. Plaintiff may proceed without designating local counsel; and William P. Ramey, III from the law firm of Ramey LLP is permitted to represent Plaintiff in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 3/4/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/26 9:05 AM
ORDER granting14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Pocketstop LLC answer due 3/26/2025. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/25/2025) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/24 3:10 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Pocketstop LLC (Conrad, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Tue 02/04 1:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pocketstop LLC ; served on 2/3/2025. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time Wed 01/29 5:15 PM
MOTION to Extend Time Time to Serve filed by Verna IP Holdings LLC (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, October 28, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 10/28 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B Conrad on behalf of Pocketstop LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Conrad, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 10/28 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Pocketstop LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned (Public Entry) Thu 09/26 8:28 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Sam A. Lindsay pursuant to Special Order 3-352. Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater no longer assigned to the case. (axm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 09/24 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Pocketstop LLC. (ndt)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs misc Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office Tue 09/24 3:41 PM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ndt)
Related: [-]
7 7 qcref Fitzwater Tue 09/24 3:26 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/24 2:58 PM
MOTION Motion for Waiver of the Local Counsel Requirement filed by Verna IP Holdings LLC (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/24 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Verna IP Holdings, LLC (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
4 4 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 09/24 10:20 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Verna IP Holdings, LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 09/24 10:19 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Verna IP Holdings, LLC. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/24 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent (AO-120) filed by Verna IP Holdings, LLC (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/24 10:17 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Pocketstop, LLC filed by Verna IP Holdings, LLC. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14940281) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet