LOKI BRANDS LLC et al v. PLATKIN et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Zahid N Quraishi |
Referred: | Tonianne J Bongiovanni |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-09389 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | Sep 24, 2024 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 5:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
DIANNA HOUENOU
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MATTHEW J. PLATKIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EDWARD D. WENGRYN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALPHA OMEGA COLLECTIS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALTERNATIVE HEALTH DISTRIBUTION LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CANTRIP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LOKI BRANDS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M&A LL HOLDINGS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NORTH FORK DISTRIBUTION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 14, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() USCA Case Number 24-3120 for20 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by NORTH FORK DISTRIBUTION, INC., CANTRIP, INC., LOKI BRANDS LLC, ALTERNATIVE HEALTH DISTRIBUTION LLC, ALPHA OMEGA COLLECTIS LLC, M&A LL HOLDINGS LLC. USCA Case Manager Aina (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3gch) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL as to19 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,18 Opinion by LOKI BRANDS LLC, NORTH FORK DISTRIBUTION, INC., CANTRIP, INC., ALPHA OMEGA COLLECTIS LLC, ALTERNATIVE HEALTH DISTRIBUTION LLC, M&A LL HOLDINGS LLC. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANJDC-15802515. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 11/12/2024. (CARUCCI, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, October 10, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER granting in part and denying in part6 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is ORDERED that JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants Matthew J. Platkin, Dianna Houenou, and Edward D. Wengryn (in their official capacities) that permanently enjoins Defendants from enforcing the provisions of the New Jersey Hemp Act Amendments, Pub. L. 2024, c. 73, that exempt otherwise compliant out-of-state hemp and hemp products from the definition of "Intoxicating Hemp Products," and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk's Office is instructed to mark this matter CLOSED. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/10/2024. Modified on 10/10/2024 (mlh) |
|
18 | 18
![]() OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/10/2024. (mlh) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 10/10 10:17 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mlh) |
||
Friday, October 04, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (URMSTON, PETER) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (YANG, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, September 27, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALTERNATIVE HEALTH DISTRIBUTION LLC, M&A LL HOLDINGS LLC, NORTH FORK DISTRIBUTION, INC., CANTRIP, INC., LOKI BRANDS LLC, ALPHA OMEGA COLLECTIS LLC. EDWARD D. WENGRYN served on 9/25/2024, answer due 10/16/2024. (URMSTON, PETER) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALTERNATIVE HEALTH DISTRIBUTION LLC, M&A LL HOLDINGS LLC, NORTH FORK DISTRIBUTION, INC., CANTRIP, INC., LOKI BRANDS LLC, ALPHA OMEGA COLLECTIS LLC. DIANNA HOUENOU waiver sent on 9/25/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (URMSTON, PETER) |
|
13 | 13
order
Text Order
Thu 09/26 11:00 AM
|
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTINE M LONGA on behalf of All Defendants (LONGA, JUSTINE) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW HWEYOUNG YANG on behalf of All Defendants (YANG, ANDREW) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 09/26 10:45 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Status Conference held on 9/26/2024. (kas) |
||
Wednesday, September 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re 7 Text Order,, Set Hearings, by Michael S. Carucci (URMSTON, PETER) |
|
9 | 9
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Michael S. Carucci (URMSTON, PETER) |
|
8 | 8
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALTERNATIVE HEALTH DISTRIBUTION LLC, M&A LL HOLDINGS LLC, NORTH FORK DISTRIBUTION, INC., CANTRIP, INC., LOKI BRANDS LLC, ALPHA OMEGA COLLECTIS LLC. MATTHEW J. PLATKIN waiver sent on 9/25/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (CARUCCI, MICHAEL) |
|
7 | 7
order
Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 09/25 11:23 AM
TEXT ORDER that a telephonic case management conference regarding the Motion for Order to Show Cause6 will be conducted before the undersigned on 09/26/2024 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall dial into 888-398-2342, access code 3570932. Plaintiff shall immediately serve this Text Order on Defendants. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi 9/25/2024.(kas) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/25 10:52 AM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause . Motion set for 10/21/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, ) |
||
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION for Order to Show Cause by ALPHA OMEGA COLLECTIS LLC, ALTERNATIVE HEALTH DISTRIBUTION LLC, CANTRIP, INC., LOKI BRANDS LLC, M&A LL HOLDINGS LLC, NORTH FORK DISTRIBUTION, INC..(CARUCCI, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by PETER COOPER URMSTON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (URMSTON, PETER) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA ELLEN SEDLAK on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SEDLAK, LAURA) |
|
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to DIANNA HOUENOU, MATTHEW J. PLATKIN, EDWARD D. WENGRYN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALPHA OMEGA COLLECTIS LLC, ALTERNATIVE HEALTH DISTRIBUTION LLC, CANTRIP, INC., LOKI BRANDS LLC, M&A LL HOLDINGS LLC, NORTH FORK DISTRIBUTION, INC. identifying Loki Brands LLC as Corporate Parent.. (CARUCCI, MICHAEL) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against DIANNA HOUENOU, MATTHEW J. PLATKIN, EDWARD D. WENGRYN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15686732), filed by ALTERNATIVE HEALTH DISTRIBUTION LLC, M&A LL HOLDINGS LLC, NORTH FORK DISTRIBUTION, INC., CANTRIP, INC., LOKI BRANDS LLC, ALPHA OMEGA COLLECTIS LLC.(CARUCCI, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 09/24 12:43 PM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kht) |