Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert E Wier
Referred: Matthew A Stinnett
Case #: 5:24-cv-00262
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2024
Case in other court:Fayette Circuit Court, 24-CI-3031
Last checked: Saturday Mar 22, 2025 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin Paul Lemly
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart
contact info
Erin A. Shackelford
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart
contact info
William Stewart Rutchow
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Nashville
contact info
William S. Rutchow
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alvin Davis
Represented By
Rhey Mills
Brooke & Mills
contact info
Lauren R. Brooke
Smith & O'Toole Pllc - Richmond
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
23 23 motion Amend/Correct Fri 05/02 4:19 PM
FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct by Alvin Davis Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett.(Mills, Rhey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Attachment Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit D
Monday, March 31, 2025
22 22 order Scheduling Order Deadline Terminate Motions Mon 03/31 11:12 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER:19 MOTION to Amend GRANTED; 1. Fact Discovery due by 7/15/2025; 2. motions to amend pleadings, join parties due from plt by 5/2/2025; from dft by 6/2/2025; 3. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 5/28/2025 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett; 4. expert disclosures due from plt by 7/15/2025; from dft by 8/15/2025; 5. expert discovery due by 10/14/2025; 6. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 11/15/2025; 7. All other provisions of14 Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 3/31/2025.(STC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/28 3:11 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Alvin Davis filed by Alvin Davis. (Mills, Rhey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/27 12:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Alvin Davis Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings filed by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc..(Lemly, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 1.17.2025 - Termination Letter
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Wed 03/26 8:56 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: re19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Alvin Davis (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Amend Tue 03/25 4:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Alvin Davis Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett.(Mills, Rhey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, March 24, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order Deadline Mon 03/24 4:16 PM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Discovery due by 7/15/2025. 2. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 5/28/2025 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett; 3. Plt disclose experts by 7/15/2025; dft by 8/15/2025; 4. expert discovery due by 10/14/2025; 5. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 10/14/2025; 6. All other provisions of the Court's Scheduling Order14 shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 3/24/2025.(STC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
17 17 minutes Telephone Conference Thu 03/20 10:31 AM
MINUTE ENTRY ORDER for TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/19/2025 before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett: By agreement of parties, remaining deadlines of Scheduling Order shall be extended by 60 days; depositions are expected to commence w/in 60 days. Amended Scheduling Order forthcoming; parties will attempt to informally settle any discovery disputes but will contact the Court to address discovery disputes or to request a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. (STC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Wed 02/26 11:35 AM
ORDER: The Joint Motion15 is GRANTED. The pltf shall make any motions to amend the pleadings or join additional parties by 4/2/25. Dft shall have until 5/2/25 to make any motions to amend the pleadings or join additional parties.Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 2/26/2025. (KCF)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/26 11:37 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by: Pltf-4/2/25; Dft-5/2/2025. Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 4/2/25 & 5/2/2025. (KCF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 02/25 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Rhey Mills re15 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Alvin Davis Signature on document and filer do not match; Entry by attorney; the name of the Filing User under whose login and password the document is filed must be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (ADH)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Tue 02/25 2:52 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Stinnett for review: re15 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Alvin Davis (ADH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time to Amend Mon 02/24 3:01 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend by Alvin Davis Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett.(Mills, Rhey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 25, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Deadline Mon 11/25 1:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/25 for pltff and 4/2/2025 for dft. Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 3/3/25 for pltff and 4/2/2025 for dft. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 3/19/2025 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. Expert Witness List due by 5/16/25 for pltff and 6/16/2025 for dft. Expert discovery due by 8/15/2025. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 9/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 11/25/24.(JLM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
utility File Submitted Thu 11/21 11:08 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review:13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JLM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 11/20 1:29 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rutchow, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order For Meeting and Report Fri 11/01 4:05 PM
ORDER: W/in 21 days, parties meet; W/in 14 days after meeting, file report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 11/1/24.(JLM)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Fri 11/01 9:06 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review:11 Answer to Complaint (JLM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/31 9:08 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc..(Lemly, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/28 1:19 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting8 Motion for William S. Rutchow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5954244); granting9 MOTION for Erin A. Shackelford to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5956210),. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 10/28/24. (JLM)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Mon 10/28 8:25 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: re9 MOTION for Erin A. Shackelford to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5956210) (JLM)
Related: [-]
notice Notice for Attorney to Request E-Filing Privileges Mon 10/28 1:22 PM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Erin A. Shackelford and William S. Rutchow: re 10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Erin A. Shackelford (JLM)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 27, 2024
misc Bar Status Check Sun 10/27 2:40 PM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Erin A. Shackelford re9 MOTION for Erin A. Shackelford to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5956210). (JLM)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/25 3:31 PM
MOTION for Erin A. Shackelford to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5956210)Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett.(Lemly, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Erin A. Shackelford,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
utility Motion Submitted Fri 10/25 6:56 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: re8 MOTION for William S. Rutchow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5954244) (JLM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/24 10:05 AM
MOTION for William S. Rutchow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5954244)Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett.(Lemly, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of William S. Rutchow,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
misc Bar Status Check Thu 10/24 4:33 PM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to William S. Rutchow re8 MOTION for William S. Rutchow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5954244). (JLM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/08 11:14 AM
ORDER: granting6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. Defendant's Response to Complaint is due on or before October 31, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 10/08/24. (JLM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 09/30 5:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett.(Lemly, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant's Motion For Extension to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
5 5 notice Attorney Notice Tue 09/24 9:13 AM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Erin Shackelford and William Rutchow by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2(KMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR
4 4 order REW Standing Case Management and Referral Order Tue 09/24 9:09 AM
STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (KMP)
Related: [-]
misc Conflict Check Tue 09/24 9:09 AM
Conflict Check run. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Tue 09/24 9:08 AM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc.. (KMP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 09/24 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-3031. ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5930083), filed by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc..(KMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Record,
Att: 2 Notice of NOR,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet