California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:24-cv-06685
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 2:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Mountain West Conference
Represented By
Simona Alessandra Agnolucci
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Eduardo E. Santacana
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Wesley Railey Powell
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Matt D. Basil
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pac-12 Conference
Represented By
Charlotte Kamai
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Anjali Srinivasan
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Eric H. MacMichael
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Nicholas Samuel Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Kelly Seranko Kaufman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Paul Von Autenried, Jr
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/08 1:47 PM
ORDER Approving 35 Joint Status Report; Continuing stay through July 15, 2025. Signed by by Judge Susan van Keulen on May 8, 2025. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
35 35 misc Status Report Wed 05/07 5:40 PM
STATUS REPORT by Pac-12 Conference.(Goldberg, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order regarding Joint Status Report Request for Extension
Monday, March 17, 2025
34 34 order Order Staying Case Mon 03/17 1:14 PM
ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen on March 17, 2025. The parties joint motion to stay 33 is GRANTED. The case is STAYED until May 16, 2025. It is further ORDERED that the March 25, 2025 hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss 25 is VACATED. The parties are directed to file a joint status report informing the Court when a date for mediation is set. This stay will not be extended unless a date certain is set for mediation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
33 33 motion Stay Fri 03/14 11:17 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Mountain West Conference. Responses due by 3/28/2025. Replies due by 4/4/2025.(Santacana, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay
Friday, February 14, 2025
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 02/14 4:07 PM
ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on February 14, 2025. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
31 31 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 02/13 3:08 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Pac-12 Conference.(MacMichael, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 10, 2025
30 30 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 02/10 9:07 AM
REPLY Related [+] (DEFENDANT THE MOUNTAIN WEST CONFERENCES REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT) filed byMountain West Conference. (Santacana, Eduardo)
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint
Monday, January 13, 2025
29 29 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 01/13 2:30 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byPac-12 Conference. (MacMichael, Eric)
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 01/08 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Charlotte Kamai on behalf of Pac-12 Conference (Kamai, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
27 27 misc Status Report Tue 12/17 10:01 PM
STATUS REPORT by Mountain West Conference. (Santacana, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/17 9:30 AM
ORDER Requesting Status Update. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on December 17, 2024. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
25 25 motion Dismiss Mon 11/25 10:25 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Mountain West Conference. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/25/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. Responses due by 12/9/2024. Replies due by 12/16/2024.(Santacana, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 11/25 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Wesley Railey Powell on behalf of Mountain West Conference (Powell, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
23 23 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 10/30 11:11 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mountain West Conference.. (Santacana, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 10/23 8:17 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE DKT. 21 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/24/24 is continued to 3/11/2025 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2025. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 10, 2025 at 12:00 PM PDT. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 10/22 4:55 PM
ORDER Granting as Modified 18 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on October 22, 2024. (svklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
20 20 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 10/17 1:32 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Mountain West Conference (Santacana, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 10/17 1:22 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/31/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 10/17 1:01 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, Set Responsive Briefing Schedule, and Reset Initial Case Management Conference filed by Mountain West Conference.(Santacana, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 10/17 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Matt D. Basil on behalf of Mountain West Conference - Pro Hac Vice (Basil, Matt)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 10/17 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Simona Alessandra Agnolucci on behalf of Mountain West Conference (Agnolucci, Simona)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 10/17 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Eduardo E. Santacana on behalf of Mountain West Conference (Santacana, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
14 14 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 10/09 4:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pac-12 Conference re13 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Kaufman, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/08 1:53 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pac-12 Conference.. (MacMichael, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/01 11:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pac-12 Conference. Mountain West Conference served on 9/26/2024, answer due 10/17/2024. (MacMichael, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/30 5:32 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Please refile as ECF Event "Summons Returned Executed." Re:11 Certificate of Service filed by Pac-12 Conference (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
11 11 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 09/27 4:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pac-12 Conference re8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,9 Summons Issued,1 Complaint, (MacMichael, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 09/25 4:31 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Pac-12 Conference Plaintiff's Certification of Conflicts and Interested Entities or Persons (Von Autenried, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 09/24 5:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Mountain West Conference. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/24 5:49 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/24/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/24 12:01 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/8/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 09/24 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Kelly Seranko Kaufman on behalf of Pac-12 Conference (Kaufman, Kelly)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 09/24 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Anjali Srinivasan on behalf of Pac-12 Conference (Srinivasan, Anjali)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 09/24 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Nicholas Samuel Goldberg on behalf of Pac-12 Conference (Goldberg, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 09/24 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Eric H. MacMichael on behalf of Pac-12 Conference (MacMichael, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 09/24 10:55 AM
Proposed Summons. (Von Autenried, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/24 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment [28 U.S.C. § 2201] against Mountain West Conference ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19878779.). Filed by Pac-12 Conference.(Von Autenried, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet