New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:24-cv-09400
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1345ij Injunction Relief
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff
COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS, LLC
Represented By
THOMAS JOSEPH COFFEY
Graham Curtin PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, October 03, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 10/03 4:59 PM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/3/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Thu 10/03 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS, LLC (COFFEY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 09/27 12:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Complaint OTSC served on Ellen Jones on 09 26-2024 filed by COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS, LLC. (COFFEY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 09/27 11:42 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Fri 09/27 11:41 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (wh)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 09/27 11:42 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (wh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/27 11:43 AM
Set Deadlines as to2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 10/21/2024 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
3 3 1 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 09/24 3:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS, LLC. (COFFEY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 09/24 3:46 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS, LLC.(COFFEY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Memorandum Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/24 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15687943), filed by COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS, LLC.(COFFEY, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Exhibit A
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/26 8:38 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
Related: [-]