Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephanie M Rose
Referred: Stephen B Jackson, Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-00337
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Saturday, May 03, 2025
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Sat 05/03 10:42 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment signed affidavit by Micky Noble. Responses due by 5/27/2025. (Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/02 1:40 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Micky Noble. Responses due by 5/23/2025.(Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Facts,
Att: 3 Affidavit of McCleary,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Noble,
Att: 5 Appendix
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 02/04 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Derek Underdahl. Plaintiff's address updated to FCI Greenville. (nla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
10 10 notice Notice - Other Tue 01/28 3:27 PM
NOTICE by Micky Noble . (Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/03 8:28 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motion Deadline 5/2/2025. (btg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/02 12:28 PM
ORDER SETTING DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE. Dispositive motions due May 2, 2025. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 1/2/2025. (nan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 2:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Micky Noble.(Morgan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/04 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Morgan on behalf of Micky Noble (Morgan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/04 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Wilford H. Stone on behalf of Micky Noble (Stone, Wilford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/31 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Kragnes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kragnes, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
4 4 7 pgs order Order Wed 10/30 3:50 PM
INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 10/30/2024. (nan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
3 3 notice Notice - Other Thu 10/03 3:23 PM
NOTICE by Derek Underdahl. (btg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/24 3:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derek Spencer Underdahl. (btg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/24 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Derek Spencer Underdahl. (btg)
Related: [-]