Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 7:24-cv-00240
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 5:02 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
Random Chat, LLC
Represented By
William P. Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Eugene Kubiak
Ramey LLP
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Kate Spade & Company, LLC
Represented By
Julie Metkus
contact info
Michael A. Vincent
Fish & Richardson, P.C.
contact info
Neil J. McNabnay
Fish & Richardson, PC
contact info
Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Tapestry, Inc.
Represented By
Julie Metkus
contact info
Michael A. Vincent
Fish & Richardson, P.C.
contact info
Neil J. McNabnay
Fish & Richardson, PC
contact info
Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Random Chat, LLC
Represented By
William P. Ramey, III
Ramey LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Eugene Kubiak
Ramey LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kate Spade & Company, LLC
Terminated: 01/16/2025
Represented By
Julie Metkus
contact info
Michael A. Vincent
Fish & Richardson, P.C.
contact info
Neil J. McNabnay
Fish & Richardson, PC
contact info
Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
32 32 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Tue 04/22 11:46 AM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (r013)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/22 11:15 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge David Counts. (jb3)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/21 4:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Random Chat, LLC. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 02/20 4:30 PM
ORDER CANCELLING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCEHELD IN PERSON. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (slt)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 02/20 4:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2026 01:30 PM in Waco before Judge Derek T. Gilliland,, Jury Selection set for 8/3/2026 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts,, Jury Trial set for 8/3/2026 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts,, Markman Hearing set for 7/31/2025 09:00 AM in Waco before Judge Derek T. Gilliland,, Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2025,, Discovery due by 2/26/2026,, Joinder of Parties due by 9/11/2025,, Motions due by 5/7/2026,), Motions terminated:27 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Random Chat, LLC.. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (slt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
27 27 motion Entry of Scheduling Order Mon 02/17 12:24 PM
Agreed MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Random Chat, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
26 26 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Mon 02/17 12:12 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Random Chat, LLC. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/31 3:05 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Tapestry, Inc., re17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Kate Spade & Company, LLC (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
24 24 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/24 5:16 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Random Chat, LLC, re17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Kate Spade & Company, LLC(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order
Friday, January 17, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/17 10:59 AM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD IN PERSON. Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2025 at 02:00 PM in Waco before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (slt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
22 22 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 01/16 4:20 PM
ANSWER to18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Random Chat, LLC.(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Thu 01/16 2:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING20 Motion to Substitute Party. Tapestry, Inc. added. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (slt) Modified Judge on 1/16/2025 (slt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
20 20 motion Substitute Party Wed 01/15 3:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Kate Spade & Company, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
19 19 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 01/10 3:15 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kate Spade & Company, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Tapestry, Inc. for Kate Spade & Company, LLC, Kate Spade & Company, LLC. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 01/10 3:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Random Chat, LLC by Kate Spade & Company, LLC.(Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/10 3:11 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kate Spade & Company, LLC.(Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 01/06 5:20 PM
Text Order GRANTING16 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is ORDERED that Kate Spades deadline to respond to Random Chats Complaint shall be extended up to and including January 10, 2024. Entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DTG)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/03 3:14 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Kate Spade & Company, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 02, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/02 2:31 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julie Metkus for Kate Spade & Company, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (slt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 11/27 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of Kate Spade & Company, LLC. Attorney Ricardo Joel Bonilla added to party Kate Spade & Company, LLC(pty:dft) (Bonilla, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 11/27 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Vincent on behalf of Kate Spade & Company, LLC. Attorney Michael A. Vincent added to party Kate Spade & Company, LLC(pty:dft) (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 10:37 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil J. McNabnay on behalf of Julie Metkus ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19523660) by on behalf of Kate Spade & Company, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 11/27 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J. McNabnay on behalf of Kate Spade & Company, LLC. Attorney Neil J. McNabnay added to party Kate Spade & Company, LLC(pty:dft) (McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/26 3:05 PM
Text Order GRANTING10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to January 3, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/25 11:41 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Kate Spade & Company, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Vincent, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/14 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Random Chat, LLC. Kate Spade & Company, LLC served on 11/8/2024, answer due 11/29/2024. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/25 3:17 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 09/25 3:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Kate Spade & Company, LLC. (slt)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/25 3:02 PM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts pursuant to the Order Assigning Business of the Court as it Relates to Patent Cases filed 7/25/2022 . CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 09/25 3:19 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (slt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
6 6 notice Notice Tue 09/24 4:54 PM
NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by Random Chat, LLC(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Tue 09/24 4:52 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Random Chat, LLC. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/24 4:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Random Chat, LLC. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 09/24 4:51 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/24 4:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Random Chat, LLC. (Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/24 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19267537), filed by Random Chat, LLC.(Ramey, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet