Consolidated
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047

California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:24-cv-06711
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Case in other court:North Carolina Eastern, 7:24-cv-00485
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 2:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Meta Payments Inc
Defendant
YouTube LLC
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
Defendant
TikTok LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
TikTok Inc. 5800 Bristol Parkway Suite 100
Culver City, CA 90230
Defendant
Snap Inc.
3000 31st Street
Santa Monica, CA 90405
Defendant
Siculus Inc.
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.,
Defendant
Instagram LLC
Defendant
Google LLC
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
Defendant
Facebook Operations LLC
Defendant
Facebook Holdings LLC
Defendant
Bytedance Ltd
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
ByteDance Inc. 1920 Olympic Blvd
Santa Monica, CA 90404
Plaintiff
The Board of Education For The Public Schools of Robeson County
Represented By
Philip C. Federico
Schochor, Federico & Staton, P.A.
contact info
Janet Ward Black
Ward Black Law
contact info
Matthew P. Legg
Brockstedt Mandalas Federico LLC
contact info
Emily J. Beeson
Ward Black Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, October 07, 2024
11 11 cmp Complaint Mon 10/07 8:59 AM
COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants. Filed by The Board of Education For The Public Schools of Robeson County. (Legg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
utility MDL Member Case Wed 09/25 4:48 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 4:22-md-03047-YGR; Eastern District of North Carolina, 7:24-cv-00485 The Board of Education for The Public Schools of Robeson County v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al, opened in California Northern District as 4:24-cv-06711-YGR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 35 cc: JPMDL (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 09/24 3:50 PM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 7:24-cv-00485. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/24 3:12 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 6, 2022, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Marcella R. Lockert, Acting Clerk of the Panel, on 9/24/2024. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/24 3:11 PM
Document: Text Minute Order - As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Acting Clerk of the Panel Marcella R. Lockert on 9/24/2024. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/24 3:10 PM
Document: Email of Text Order from Marcella R. Lockert, Clerk of the MDL Panel, regarding MDL 3047, advising our court of the conditional transfer order filed by the Panel and inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 09/24 3:13 PM
Case transferred to Northern District of California. File transmitted electronically. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
6 6 Summons Issued as to ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok Inc., TikTok, LLC, TikTok, Ltd., YouTube, LLC. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
5 5 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Philip C. Federico on behalf of The Board of Education for The Public Schools of Robeson County. (Federico, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Proposed Summons. The proposed summons have an attorney's name and address for an attorney that has not made an appearance in this case. Counsel shall revise and refile. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
4 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily J. Beeson on behalf of The Board of Education for The Public Schools of Robeson County. (Beeson, Emily)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Janet Ward Black on behalf of The Board of Education for The Public Schools of Robeson County. (Black, Janet Ward)
Related: [-]
2 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Board of Education for The Public Schools of Robeson County (Black, Janet Ward)
Related: [-]
1 1 184 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7651292.), filed by The Board of Education for The Public Schools of Robeson County. (Black, Janet Ward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Meta Platforms, Inc.,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Facebook Payments, Inc.,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Siculus, Inc.,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Facebook Operations, LLC,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Instagram, LLC,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Snap Inc.,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons TikTok Inc.,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons TikTok, LTD.,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons TikTok, LLC,
Att: 11 Proposed Summons Bytedance LTD,
Att: 12 Proposed Summons Bytedance Inc.,
Att: 13 Proposed Summons Google LLC,
Att: 14 Proposed Summons Youtube, LLC,
Att: 15 Proposed Summons Facebook Holdings, LLC,
Att: 16 Proposed Summons Meta Payments, Inc.