Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:24-bk-05171
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025

Debtor
Locker Family Farms, INC
1660 S 675 E
Greenfield, IN 46140-9727
Represented By
Patrick C Badell
Badell & Wilson, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Sarah Fowler
Sarah Fowler, Chapter 7 Trustee 101 W. Ohio St. Suite 1700
Indianapolis, IN 46204
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 46 E Ohio Street, Room 520
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 09/25/2024 12:02 AM EDT
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/24 2:28 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 24-05171 7] ) [misc,volp7] (338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A35210538. Fee amount 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 40 pgs misc Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Tue 09/24 2:19 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) with Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedule(s) A/B, D, E/F, G and H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Attorney Disclosure of Compensation and Verification of Creditor List filed by Patrick C Badell on behalf of Locker Family Farms, INC. Income & Expense Schedule due by 10/08/2024. (Badell, Patrick)
Related: [-]