California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:24-cv-08240
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 2:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Sterling Infosystems, Inc.
Represented By
Jasmine Jane Stanzick
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christian Allen Alvarado
Represented By
Jenna Dakroub
Consumer Justice Law Firm PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, March 06, 2025
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 03/06 1:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL. The case is therefore closed. Accordingly, the Court strikes the proposed order (ECF No. [22-1]) as moot, and all pending dates are vacated and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
22 22 stip Dismiss Party Tue 02/25 1:43 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado.(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 01/22 8:49 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: On January 20, 2025, Plaintiff filed a "Notice of Settlement" at docket20 . The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for March 26, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal by March 24, 2025, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All pending dates are vacated, including the Scheduling Conference set for hearing January 22, 2025. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
20 20 notice Settlement Mon 01/20 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
19 19 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 01/14 2:25 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado.. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 01/13 5:07 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed at ECF No. 15 fails to include a joint proposed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, as required by the Court's standing order. The parties must complete and file no later than January 20, 2025, the proposed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, which may be found on the Court's website. The Court hereby continues the Scheduling Conference from January 15, 2025, to January 22, 2025, and denies the Joint Request to Appear Remotely (ECF No. 17) as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
17 17 motion Appear Thu 01/09 1:26 PM
Joint REQUEST for Leave of Jasmine J. Stanzick and Jenna Dakroub to Appear for remotely at Initial Status Conference filed by defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc.. Request set for hearing on 1/15/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Stanzick, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Thu 01/02 8:01 AM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jenna Dakroub counsel for Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. Changing Firm name to CONSUMER JUSTICE LAW FIRM PLC. Changing Email and fax number to E: jdakroub@consumerjustice.com; F: (480) 613-7733. Filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
15 15 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 12/31 12:53 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado.. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 11/15 2:20 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/2/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 11/12 11:30 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc..(Stanzick, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 10/17 12:42 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc., identifying Sterling Check Corp.. (Stanzick, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 10/17 12:38 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sterling Infosystems, Inc. answer now due 11/12/2024, filed by defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc..(Attorney Jasmine Jane Stanzick added to party Sterling Infosystems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Stanzick, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 10/09 4:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado, upon Defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc. served on 9/30/2024, answer due 10/21/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chris Mayes, Client Representative in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 09/27 6:08 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 09/25 12:32 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 09/25 12:28 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 09/25 12:27 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 09/25 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 09/24 9:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/24 9:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado, (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 09/24 9:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. (Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 09/24 9:28 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38275580 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Christian Allen Alvarado. (Attorney Jenna Dakroub added to party Christian Allen Alvarado(pty:pla))(Dakroub, Jenna)
Related: [-]