California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-03837
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2024
Terminated:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 25, 2024 12:21 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Billy Ruiz (1)
Terminated: 07/01/2024
Represented By
R. Reid Rowe
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/25/2024 1:21 AM PDT
Thursday, June 27, 2024
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Billy Ruiz, originating in the Middle District of Florida. Defendant charged in violation of: 21:841(a)(1); 21:846. Signed by agent Lynelle Berrios, DEA. filed by Plaintiff USA. (jb)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Billy Ruiz; defendants Year of Birth: 1978; date of arrest: 6/26/2024 (jb)
Related: [-]
3 3 Defendant Billy Ruiz arrested on warrant issued by the USDC Middle District of Florida at Orlando.(jb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Document: Middle District of Florida
4 4 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Billy Ruiz (jb)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner as to Defendant Billy Ruiz. Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: R. Reid Rowe for Billy Ruiz, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Government's request for detention is: CONTINUED Court orders defendant Temporarily detained. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 7/1/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, courtroom 550. Court Smart: CS 6/27/2024. (jb)
Related: [-]
6 6 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Billy Ruiz. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (jb)
Related: [-]
7 7 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Billy Ruiz. (jb)
Related: [-]
8 8 ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS filed by Defendant Billy Ruiz (jb)
Related: [-]