Maryland District Court
Judge:George Levi Russell, III
Case #: 1:24-cv-02757
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
DR Horton Inc.
Represented By
Rahool Patel
Porzio Bromberg & Newman, P.C.
contact info
Kerri A. Wright
Porzio Bromberg & Newman
contact info
Kristen Nichole Nesbitt
Goodell Devries Leech And Dann LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
Eric Stephen Thompson
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/02 11:01 AM
Marginal ORDER APPROVING18 Status Report filed by DR Horton Inc.; ADOPTING the requested changes to the Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/2/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
18 18 misc Status Report Fri 03/28 9:33 AM
STATUS REPORT , Joint, by DR Horton Inc.(Nesbitt, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/13 12:20 PM
ORDER Directing parties to submit an updated Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days indicating the status of settlement discussions and answering the seven points as outlined in this Court's November 22, 2024 Order (ECF No. 5). Signed by Chief Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/13/2025. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
16 16 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 01/09 1:03 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by DR Horton Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for DR Horton Inc..(Nesbitt, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
15 15 4 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Thu 12/12 11:16 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/12/2024. (daws, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 12/10 2:21 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for settlement conference. Signed by Chief Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/10/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/10 1:30 PM
ORDER memorializing the agreements reached during the teleconference to discuss the schedule in this case held on 12/10/2024. Signed by Chief Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/10/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/09 1:45 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rahool Patel. Directing attorney Rahool Patel to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/09 1:28 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kerri A. Wright. Directing attorney Kerri A. Wright to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
10 10 corresp Settlement Conference - requesting Thu 12/05 6:48 PM
Settlement Conference - requesting (Thompson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/04 3:36 PM
Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rahool Patel (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11643772.) by DR Horton Inc.(Nesbitt, Kristen)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/04 3:32 PM
Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kerri A. Wright (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11643746.) by DR Horton Inc.(Nesbitt, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
7 7 order Order Tue 12/03 9:24 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER The telephone conference call previously set for December 9, 2024 is rescheduled to December 10, 2024, at 9:15 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel is requested to initiate the call to 410-962-4055. The telephone conference will be recorded. Signed by Chief Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/3/2024. (jk6s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
6 6 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Mon 12/02 8:05 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by DR Horton Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DR Horton, Inc. for DR Horton Inc..(Nesbitt, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/22 3:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/7/2025. Signed by Chief Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/22/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Preliminary Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 Standing Order on Discovery Procedures
notice Deficiency Notice Fri 11/22 3:29 PM
Deficiency Notice for DR Horton Inc.-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 11/29/2024 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/21 6:56 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by DR Horton Inc..(Nesbitt, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/27 11:20 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. DR Horton Inc. waiver sent on 9/25/2024, answer due 11/25/2024.(Thompson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
2 2 service Request for Waiver of Service Wed 09/25 3:00 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DR Horton Inc. on 09-25-24 by EEOC. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2024.(Thompson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 unexecuted waiver of service
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/25 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT against DR Horton, filed by EEOC.(Thompson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet