Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Judge:D Edward Snow
Case #: 6:24-cv-00347
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Case in other court:Love County District Court, CJ-23-00070
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 3:41 AM CDT
Defendant
American Risk Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By
Jon E. Brightmire
Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson (tulsa)
contact info
Alexandra J. Gage
Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson (tulsa)
contact info
Sara E. Potts
Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson (okc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiffany Hampton Schierling
Represented By
Jason Bolitho
Bolitho Law, PLLC
contact info
Matthew Reinstein
Lawter & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
27 27 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Fri 03/28 4:30 PM
DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (Gage, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
26 26 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Thu 03/27 6:06 PM
First DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Tiffany Hampton Schierling (Bolitho, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
25 25 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Tue 03/25 2:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting scheduling order date(s): Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2025. Exhibit List due by 8/1/2025. Witness List due by 8/1/2025. Discovery due by 9/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2025. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 11/18/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2025 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 201, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. In light of the scheduling order entered, the Scheduling Conference previously set for 3/27/2025 is hereby STRICKEN. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
24 24 misc Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 Fri 03/21 1:03 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (Gage, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
23 23 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Wed 03/05 2:41 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting Scheduling Conference for 3/27/2025 at 11:00 AM in Chambers, Room 201, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 3/21/2025. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) Wed 03/05 8:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow granting20 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s). Attorney Matthew Reinstein withdrawn is hereby deemed withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiff. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
21 21 order 02 - Minute Order 09 - MO Consent to Magistrate Judge Disposition of Case Tue 03/04 3:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III: The parties have expressly indicated by the submission of consent forms signed by an authorized representative of each party in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. As a result, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. The consent forms will be maintained in the Clerk's office. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-347-DES. (kch, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Withdraw Attorney(s) Tue 03/04 1:14 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Matthew Reinstein by Tiffany Hampton Schierling Responses due by 3/18/202 Related [+]
Related: [-] instein, Matthew
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 02/26 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason Bolitho by on behalf of Tiffany Hampton Schierling (Bolitho, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
18 18 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Mon 10/28 3:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow: The Rule 73 Conference previously set for 10/29/2024 is hereby STRICKEN. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 10/24 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason Bolitho by on behalf of Tiffany Hampton Schierling (Bolitho, Jason)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 10/24 11:30 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Reinstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related [+]
Related: [-] instein, Matthew
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
15 15 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Tue 10/15 1:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow setting Rule 73 Conference for 10/29/2024 at 11:00 AM in Chambers, Room 201, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Referred to MJ Tue 10/15 10:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III, referring case to Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC § 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-24-347-JFH-DES. (tlp, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
13 13 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Tue 10/08 9:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-24-347-JFH. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to State Court Petition/Complaint Wed 10/02 10:02 AM
ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court Related [+] by American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (Brightmire, Jon)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/02 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Defendant's Withdrawal of its Application for Order of Dismissal Pursuant to 12 OS 2004(I) with Concurrent Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Timely Service by American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (With attachments)(Brightmire, Jon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
10 10 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 09/25 3:21 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Bolitho on behalf of Tiffany Hampton Schierling (Bolitho, Jason)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 09/25 2:33 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sara E. Potts on behalf of American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (Potts, Sara)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 09/25 2:17 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra J. Gage on behalf of American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (Gage, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Wed 09/25 1:38 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent american risk holdings company for American Risk Insurance Company, Inc.) by American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (Brightmire, Jon)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 09/25 1:36 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jon E. Brightmire on behalf of American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (Brightmire, Jon)
Related: [-]
5 5 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Parties to File Disclosure Statements Wed 09/25 1:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Submission of Notice of Consent or DJO in Magistrate Assigned Cases Wed 09/25 1:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, The parties are advised that this case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial should all parties consent to jurisdiction. Consent or election of a District Judge Option may be exercised by completing the Consent Form (Civil Case Originally Assigned to Magistrate Judge) on this Court's website at[LINK:https://www.oked.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil] in accordance with the procedure outlined therein. If a party does not wish to consent to such jurisdiction, they must complete the Reassignment section. Completed forms should be submitted in PDF format to Consents_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov within twenty-one days. (Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/16/2024) (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - New CV Notice of Removal Case Filing Fee Payment Wed 09/25 1:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $405 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 10/2/2024) Related [+] (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Removal
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Wed 09/25 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Removal from Love County District Court, case number CJ-2023-70 by American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (With attachments) (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/25 1:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Paid in Full - CV Wed 09/25 1:40 PM
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/25/2024 in the amount of $405, receipt number AOKEDC-1996226 Related [+] by American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. (Brightmire, Jon)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Removal
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
cmp State Court Petition/Complaint Wed 09/25 1:02 PM
AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. by Tiffany Hampton Schierling. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against American Risk Insurance Company, Inc. by Tiffany Hampton Schierling. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]