Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Case #: 1:24-cv-02652
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause29:1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Terminated:Mar 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 2:24 AM MDT
Defendant
Kyle Paxon Bigger
Represented By
Dean Elliot Richardson
Gould + Ratner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sell My House Fast LLC
Represented By
Paul Howard Schwartz
Shoemaker Ghiselli & Schwartz, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, March 21, 2025
32 32 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Fri 03/21 11:22 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 3/21/2025. Text Only Entry (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Fri 03/21 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Sell My House Fast LLC (Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Tue 03/04 7:17 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Dean Elliot Richardson (Richardson, Dean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
29 29 order Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict Wed 02/19 3:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING26 Motion for Leave to Restrict by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 2/19/2025. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court is satisfied that the requirements of Local Rule 7.2 are met, therefore, the documents filed at ECF No. 25 shall be and remain restricted at Level 1. This ruling, however, does not apply to how such information will be handled in hearings, orders, or trial. Text Only Entry (sbplc4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
28 28 order Order Referring Motion Tue 02/18 12:42 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 26 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Sell My House Fast LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/18/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 02/13 5:09 PM
REPLY to Response to20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Kyle Paxon Bigger. (Richardson, Dean)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Leave to Restrict Thu 02/13 2:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Sell My House Fast LLC.(Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss
Thursday, January 30, 2025
25 25 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Thu 01/30 4:49 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Sell My House Fast LLC.. (Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
24 24 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/23 4:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 01/23/2025. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 01/23 4:51 PM
CORUTROOM MINUTES for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/23/2025 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Scheduling Order entered. FTR: A502. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
22 22 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 01/16 5:03 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Sell My House Fast LLC. (Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
21 21 order Order Referring Motion Mon 01/13 10:46 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kyle Paxon Bigger. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 1/13/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
20 20 motion Dismiss Fri 01/10 5:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Kyle Paxon Bigger.(Richardson, Dean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Friday, December 06, 2024
19 19 order Minute Order Fri 12/06 4:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 12/06/2024: The Parties are advised that the courtroom and chambers of Magistrate Judge Susan Prose will be relocated to Courtroom A502 on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver Colorado effective December 11, 2024. Any parties wishing to appear in-person after this date should make note of the Court's new location. Remote appearance information, including teleconference lines or videoconference links, remains unchanged. The dates and times of all settings remain unchanged, unless otherwise ordered. Text Only Entry (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion to Reset Wed 12/04 3:30 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on December 4, 2024. The parties'16 Motion to Reset is GRANTED . Proposed scheduling order (including a copy in Word format to[LINK:Prose_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] ) due January 16, 2025 . The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held telephonically on January 23, 2025 , at 11:30 a.m. , in Courtroom C-205, on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. Text Only Entry (sbplc4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
17 17 order Order Referring Motion Tue 12/03 3:31 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 16 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Sell My House Fast LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 12/3/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Reset Tue 12/03 2:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Sell My House Fast LLC.(Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
15 15 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 11/27 3:21 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan B. Prose. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 11/27/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Wed 11/27 3:15 PM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall be designated 24-cv-02652-RMR Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Letter Reassigning Case Wed 11/27 9:48 AM
CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. All parties do not consent. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-02652-REB. (Text Only Entry) (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Wed 11/27 9:02 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Sell My House Fast LLC All parties do not consent.. (Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 11/26 2:37 PM
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on November 26, 2024. Defendant's10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond is GRANTED . Defendant's answer/response due no later than January 10, 2025 . Text Only Entry (sbplc4)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 11/26 12:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, by Defendant Kyle Paxon Bigger.(Richardson, Dean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/30 4:47 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on October 30, 2024. Consent form due December 24, 2024 . Proposed scheduling order (including a copy in Word format to[LINK:Prose_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] ) due December 31, 2024 . The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held telephonically on January 8, 2025 , at 10:30 a.m. , in Courtroom C-205, on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict Wed 10/16 1:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO RESTRICT by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on October 16, 2024. For the reasons stated in the Motion, the court is satisfied that the requirements of Local Rule 7.2 are met; therefore, the court grants the6 Motion for Leave. The documents filed at ECF No. 5 (including all attachments) shall be and remain restricted at Level One. This ruling, however, does not apply to how such information will be handled in hearings, orders, or trial. Text Only Entry (sbplc4)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 10/16 12:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sell My House Fast LLC. Kyle Paxon Bigger waiver sent on 9/27/2024, answer due 11/26/2024. (Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
6 6 motion Leave to Restrict Wed 10/09 4:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Sell My House Fast LLC. (Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
5 5 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Wed 09/25 12:57 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Complaint by Plaintiff Sell My House Fast LLC..(Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Lead Count & Revenue Table,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Investment Dollars Table,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Namecheap Portal,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Lead Count Table,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from J Gurney, 2024-08-23,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - LLC Articles and Certificate of Organization,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Screenshot of Sell My House Fasts Website Forms and Phone Number, last accessed Sept. 20, 2024,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - SMHF & HBN SiteMaps,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Screenshot of Script Used to Index& Deindex,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Screenshot of Serprobot Tracking Software,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Screenshot of Search Engine Results Page,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Screenshot of SMHF Book Materials,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Content Plans for SMHF & HBN,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Screenshots of Website Features for SMHF & HBN,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Screenshot of SEO tool for SMHF & HBN,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Screenshot of CSS Form Styling Code,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Screenshot of Third-Party Call Team Form,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Screenshots of SMHF & HBN Social Media Strategy & Script Supporting Company Pages,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - Screenshots of Web Archives of SMHF & HBN and URLs,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - Collection of Text Messages & Slacks between K. Bigger & A. Kolodgie, March April 2022,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - AirTable Entries of First Leads from SMHF and HBN,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - Entry of First Lead from PropertyLeads.com,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - Trade Name Filing,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - Text Message re Use Case for CashOffers, 2022-04-05,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 - Text Message re CashOffers Domain, 2022-12-08,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - Screenshot of Web Archive of CashOffers.com from Dec. 24, 2022,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - Text Message re 301 Redirection,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 - Text Message re Potential Sale of SMHF Domain, June 11, 2022,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 - Text Message re Contribute SMHF, June 21, 2022,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30 - Slack Message re SellMyHouseFast.com, July 2022,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31 - Slack Message re Domain Purchaser, August 2022,
Att: 32 Exhibit 32 - Text Message re Domain Access, Dec. 9, 2022,
Att: 33 Exhibit 33 - Text Message re Trademark, March 2023,
Att: 34 Exhibit 34 - Text Message re Consolation Prize, 2023-06-04,
Att: 35 Exhibit 35 - Text Message re Selling CashOffers, 2023-09-09,
Att: 36 Exhibit 36 - Payments to Members,
Att: 37 Exhibit 37 - Schedule K-1, 2023,
Att: 38 Exhibit 38 - Text Message re 3 Out of 3 Domains, 2022-06-15,
Att: 39 Exhibit 39 - Text Message re Locked Out of Domains, 2024-03-14,
Att: 40 Exhibit 40 - Google results page
4 4 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Wed 09/25 12:24 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 09/25 12:24 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Administrative Notice Wed 09/25 12:23 PM
Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 33 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/25 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Kyle Paxon Bigger (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9890243)Attorney Paul Howard Schwartz added to party Sell My House Fast LLC(pty:pla), filed by Sell My House Fast LLC.(Schwartz, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement