Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Kyle C Dudek
Case #: 2:24-cv-00901
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Seequelle Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Jacob Anthony Guariglia
Jimerson Birr P.A.
contact info
Benjamin H. Yormak
Yormak Employment & Disability Law
contact info
Stewart J Subjinski
Jimerson Birr, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristi Vega
Represented By
Benjamin H. Yormak
Yormak Employment & Disability Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
21 21 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 02/19 8:32 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
20 20 order Order Fri 02/14 5:52 PM
TEXT ORDER. The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. 19 ). The Stipulation is self-executing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC , 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and motions and close the file. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 2/14/2025. (ACG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/05 2:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kristi Vega. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of settlement Tue 01/07 10:01 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Kristi Vega (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
16 16 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 01/06 12:52 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/9/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 2/9/2025. Discovery due by 11/28/2025. Dispositive motions due by 12/26/2025. Pretrial statement due by 6/12/2026. All other motions due by 6/8/2026. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/30/2025. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/29/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2026 at 01:30 PM via Zoom Video Conference before Judge John L. Badalamenti. Jury Trial set for 7/1/2026 at 09:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/5/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/6/2025. (CGW)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Preliminary pretrial conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 01/06 12:43 PM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek: granting 14 Joint Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Selection of Mediator wthin 30 days; RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE held on 1/6/2025. (Digital) (CGW)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 01/06 12:42 PM
JOINT ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Selection of Mediator within 30 days by All Parties. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
13 13 misc Case Management Report Mon 12/30 6:03 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Subjinski, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 11/20 9:58 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Rule 16(b) Conference set for 1/6/2025 at 09:45 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. Case Management Report due by 12/29/2024. Zoom instructions will be sent via separate email to counsel of record. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 11/19 6:03 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Seequelle Partners, Inc.. (Guariglia, Jacob)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/19 6:02 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Seequelle Partners, Inc..(Guariglia, Jacob)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 11/19 5:58 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jacob Anthony Guariglia on behalf of Seequelle Partners, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Stewart Subjinski. (Guariglia, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
8 8 service Summons returned executed Fri 11/01 11:22 AM
RETURN of service executed on 10/29/2024 by Kristi Vega as to Seequelle Partners, Inc. (Yormak, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/1/2024 (ABM)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
7 7 order Civil Action Order Fri 09/27 10:23 AM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/27/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
6 6 service Summons issued Thu 09/26 9:57 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Seequelle Partners, Inc. (ELA)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/26 8:14 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:24-cv-901-JLB-KCD. (NAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 09/25 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Benjamin H. Yormak on behalf of Kristi Vega. Lead Counsel: Benjamin H. Yormak, Esq.. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/25 5:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kristi Vega. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 09/25 5:09 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kristi Vega. Related case(s): No (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/25 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Seequelle Partners, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Seequelle Partners, Inc..(Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons