Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Carlos E Mendoza
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:24-cv-01740
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Psych Pointe of Florida PLC
Plaintiff
Annele James
Represented By
Noah E. Storch
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info
Andres Kroboth
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 26, 2024
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 12/26 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RPB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/23 3:16 PM
ORDER dismissing case re 9 Notice of Settlement. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this cause is DISMISSED with prejudice subject to the right of any party, within sixty days from the date of this Order, upon good cause, to move the Court to re-open the case in accordance with Local Rule 3.09(b). The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/23/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of settlement Mon 12/23 11:29 AM
NOTICE of settlement agreement by Annele James (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
8 8 order Order Fri 09/27 9:18 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/27/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/27 9:17 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/27/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
6 6 service Summons issued Thu 09/26 6:15 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Psych Pointe of Florida PLC. (RLK)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/26 3:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Annele James. (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 09/26 3:48 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Annele James. Related case(s): No (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 09/26 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Andres Kroboth on behalf of Annele James. Lead Counsel: Andres Kroboth. (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/26 8:39 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-1740-CEM-LHP. (NAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/25 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Psych Pointe of Florida PLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22559457) filed by Annele James.(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet