Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Marcia A Crone
Case #: 1:24-cv-00393
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Terminated:Oct 01, 2024
Case in other court:431st Dentn County District Court, 24-07667-431
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Karen Marie Alvarado
Brothers, Alvarado, Piazza & Cozort, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry Brent
Represented By
Shawn Saeed Hashemi
Chalaki Law - Carrollton
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 18, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Mon 11/18 11:15 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Alvarado, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
transfer Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer Tue 10/01 1:23 PM
Intradistrict Transfer to the Sherman Division, case 4:24cv876 (tkd)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue Tue 10/01 10:31 AM
ORDER granting5 Corrected Motion to Transfer Division. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Sherman Division of the US District Court for the Eastern District of TX. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/30/24. (4 Motion to Transfer Division is terminated) (tkd)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
5 5 motion Change Venue Fri 09/27 10:28 AM
CORRECTED MOTION to Change Venue from Beaumont Division to Sherman Division by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Alvarado, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 motion Change Venue Fri 09/27 6:42 AM
MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Division by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Alvarado, Karen) Modified text on 9/27/2024 (tkd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
misc Notice of Deficiency Fri 09/27 8:21 AM
Clerk's LR CV-10(d) Notice of Deficiency as to 4 Motion to Transfer Division filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. - LR CV-7(i) or LR CR-47(a)(3) requires this document to include a certificate of conference that complies with the rule. Recommended cure: Within one day, Filer must refile with the word Corrected in the title of the document. The filer should use the "Change Venue" event and when offered the docket text enhancement dropdown, select CORRECTED so it will also appear in the docket text. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 09/26 9:53 AM
ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in state court) against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., filed by Terry Brent.(tkd)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/26 9:49 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (tkd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 09/26 9:54 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (tkd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/26 9:54 AM
ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in state court) to2 Original Petition, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(tkd)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 09/25 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from 371 Denton County, case number 24-7667 431. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10380609), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Alvarado, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Appendix Index of Documents,
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Documents,
Att: 4 Exhibit List of Parties & Counsel
misc Jury Demand Thu 09/26 9:50 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (tkd)
Related: [-]