Texas Southern District Court
Judge:George C Hanks, Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-03641
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 24, 2025 3:41 AM CDT
Conflict Check Party
Ramsey Jamil Abdalbaky
Conflict Check Party
Blue Point Supply, LLC
Conflict Check Party
Capital Shield Investments, LLC
Conflict Check Party
Peak Holding Group, LLC
Conflict Check Party
Adam Karl Racca
Defendant
Energy Fishing & Rental Services, Inc.
10235 W. Little York Rd., Suite 400
Houston, TX 77040
Plaintiff
Supreme Pressure Solutions, LLC
cc/o Renshaw PC 2900 Weslayan, Suite 360
Houston, TX 77027
Represented By
Justin William Renshaw
Renshaw, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/25/2024 5:20 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT against Energy Fishing & Rental Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32241694) filed by Supreme Pressure Solutions, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] nshaw, Justin
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Statement